This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 03:24:09 (UTC).

Maravilla vs Legoland California Resort

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 Maravilla filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Legoland California Resort. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert P Dahlquist. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robert P Dahlquist

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maravilla, Veronica

Defendants

LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA RESORT

Legoland California LLC; ESA : Legoland California Resort

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Campana, David E

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KUSION & CAMPANA

4541 Artesia Blvd

Lawndale, CA 90260

Defendant Attorney

Lewis, Rosemarie S

626 Wilshire Boulevard 975

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 06/24/2022 at 10:00:00 AM in N-29 before Robert P Dahlquist at North County.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Jury Trial was rescheduled to 07/05/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in N-29 before Robert P Dahlquist at North County.

[Proposed] Order Granting Stipulation To Continue Trial Date And Related Dates

Order - Other filed by Legoland California LLC.

Stipulation To Continue Trial Date And Related Dates

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Legoland California LLC; Maravilla, Veronica.

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 1) filed by Maravilla, Veronica. Refers to: Legoland California LLC

Answer

Answer filed by Legoland California LLC.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Maravilla, Veronica.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Case Management Statement filed by Legoland California LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/29/2021 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling filed by Maravilla, Veronica.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Maravilla, Veronica. Refers to: LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA RESORT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Maravilla, Veronica. Refers to: LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA RESORT

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Maravilla, Veronica. Refers to: LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA RESORT

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-29; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-29; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 06/24/2022 at 10:00:00 AM in N-29 before Robert P Dahlquist at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 06/24/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Jury Trial was rescheduled to 07/05/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in N-29 before Robert P Dahlquist at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 07/05/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other filed by Legoland California LLC. Filed By: Legoland California LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Legoland California LLC; Maravilla, Veronica. Filed By: Legoland California LLC (Defendant); Maravilla, Veronica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 12/03/2021 at 08:30AM before Judge Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Maravilla, Veronica. Filed By: Maravilla, Veronica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Legoland California LLC. Filed By: Legoland California LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Legoland California LLC. Filed By: Legoland California LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 1) filed by Maravilla, Veronica. Refers to: Legoland California LLC Filed By: Maravilla, Veronica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/29/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Maravilla, Veronica. Filed By: Maravilla, Veronica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Maravilla, Veronica. Refers to: Legoland California LLC Filed By: Maravilla, Veronica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Maravilla, Veronica. Filed By: Maravilla, Veronica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA RESORT is a litigant

Latest cases where Legoland California LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS ROSEMARIE SUAZO