This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 08:44:49 (UTC).

Mansour vs Sachdeva DDS

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 Mansour filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Sachdeva DDS. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mansour, Delon

Defendants

Meserkhani, Vahik

HENRIOD AND MESERKHANI DENTAL PARTNERSHIP; DBA : Rancho San Diego Dental Group

Hemant Sachdeva DDS

Henriod DDS, Joel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Salmu, Scott N

Attorney at SALMU LAW FIRM APLC

343 E Main Street 202

El Cajon, CA 92020

Defendant Attorneys

WRIGHT, DAVID M

Attorney at FRASER WATSON & CROUTCH LLP

100 W Broadway Suite 650

Glendale, CA 91210

Harrison, Robert

Attorney at WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

401 West A Street 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Hemant Sachdeva DDS.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Hemant Sachdeva DDS.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Hemant Sachdeva DDS.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Hemant Sachdeva DDS.

Amended Complaint

Amendment to Complaint filed by Mansour, Delon. Refers to: HENRIOD AND MESERKHANI DENTAL PARTNERSHIP

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Mansour, Delon.

Answer (First Papers) (First Papers)

Answer filed by Henriod DDS, Joel; HENRIOD AND MESERKHANI DENTAL PARTNERSHIP.

Demand for Jury Trial (Trial/Hearing Setting)

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Henriod DDS, Joel; HENRIOD AND MESERKHANI DENTAL PARTNERSHIP.

Notice - Other (Notices) (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Henriod DDS, Joel; HENRIOD AND MESERKHANI DENTAL PARTNERSHIP.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/20/2021 09:45:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (as to Vahik Meserkhani ONLY) filed by Mansour, Delon. Refers to: Meserkhani, Vahik

Amendment to Complaint naming Doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (DOE 1) filed by Mansour, Delon. Refers to: Henriod, Joel

Amendment to Complaint naming Doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (DOE 2) filed by Mansour, Delon. Refers to: Meserkhani, Vahik

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Mansour, Delon.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Mansour, Delon.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Mansour, Delon.

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-72; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-72; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (as to Vahik Meserkhani ONLY) filed by Mansour, Delon. Refers to: Meserkhani, Vahik Filed By: Mansour, Delon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Meserkhani, Vahik .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 09/16/2022 at 08:30AM before Judge Timothy Taylor.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 09/01/2022 at 09:00AM before Judge Timothy Taylor.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/20/2021 09:45:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Henriod DDS, Joel; HENRIOD AND MESERKHANI DENTAL PARTNERSHIP. Filed By: Henriod DDS, Joel (Defendant); HENRIOD AND MESERKHANI DENTAL PARTNERSHIP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Mansour, Delon. Filed By: Mansour, Delon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (DOE 1) filed by Mansour, Delon. Refers to: Henriod DDS, Joel Filed By: Mansour, Delon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (DOE 2) filed by Mansour, Delon. Refers to: Meserkhani, Vahik Filed By: Mansour, Delon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/20/2021 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Mansour, Delon. Refers to: Hemant Sachdeva DDS; HENRIOD AND MESERKHANI DENTAL PARTNERSHIP; Henriod DDS, Joel; Meserkhani, Vahik Filed By: Mansour, Delon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mansour, Delon. Refers to: Hemant Sachdeva DDS; HENRIOD AND MESERKHANI DENTAL PARTNERSHIP Filed By: Mansour, Delon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Mansour, Delon. Refers to: Hemant Sachdeva DDS; HENRIOD AND MESERKHANI DENTAL PARTNERSHIP Filed By: Mansour, Delon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WRIGHT DAVID M. ESQ.