This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/19/2020 at 01:12:17 (UTC).

Magnussen vs Acosta

Case Summary

On 12/14/2018 Magnussen filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Acosta. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN S. MEYER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN S. MEYER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAGNUSSEN, ANGELA PATRICIA

Defendant

ACOSTA, CARMEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LANCE, JAMES R

Bryan, Olga Y

Defendant Attorneys

Kondrick, Jessica L

Byer, Jeffrey M

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Magnussen, Angela Patricia. Refers to: Acosta, Carmen

Notice of Entry of Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Magnussen, Angela Patricia.

Carmen Acosta's Answer to First Amended Complaint

Answer filed by Acosta, Carmen.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Acosta, Carmen.

First Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (First) filed by Magnussen, Angela Patricia. Refers to: Acosta, Carmen

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Magnussen, Angela Patricia.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Acosta, Carmen.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Acosta, Carmen.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply to Opposition to Demurrer to the Second and Sixth Causes of Action and to Motion to Strike

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Acosta, Carmen.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Acosta, Carmen.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Magnussen, Angela Patricia.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/21/2019 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 06/21/2019 10:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 06/21/2019 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 06/21/2019 at 10:30:00 AM in C-64 before John S. Meyer at Central.

Amended Joint Stipulation to Continue Defendant's Demurrer Hearing, Motion to Strike Hearing, and the Case Management Conference and Proposed Order Thereon

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Amended Joint Stipulation to Continue Defendant's Demurrer Hearing, Motion to Strike Hearing, and the Case Management Conference and Order Thereon) filed by Acosta, Carmen; Magnussen, Angela Patricia.

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 04/17/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Magnussen, Angela Patricia. Filed By: Magnussen, Angela Patricia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Acosta, Carmen .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Magnussen, Angela Patricia .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Magnussen, Angela Patricia. Refers to: Acosta, Carmen Filed By: Magnussen, Angela Patricia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Acosta, Carmen. Filed By: Acosta, Carmen (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Acosta, Carmen. Filed By: Acosta, Carmen (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First) filed by Magnussen, Angela Patricia. Refers to: Acosta, Carmen Filed By: Magnussen, Angela Patricia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2020 at 09:00AM before Judge John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Acosta, Carmen. Filed By: Acosta, Carmen (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 03/01/2019 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 03/01/2019 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/24/2019 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Magnussen, Angela Patricia. Refers to: Acosta, Carmen Filed By: Magnussen, Angela Patricia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Magnussen, Angela Patricia. Filed By: Magnussen, Angela Patricia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Magnussen, Angela Patricia. Filed By: Magnussen, Angela Patricia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less