This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/20/2022 at 08:06:00 (UTC).

MACDONALD VS CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Case Summary

On 07/22/2022 MACDONALD filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Macdonald, Pamela J

Defendants

Capital One Bank USA NA

Hunt & Henriques

Hunt & Henriques LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cardona Loya II, Octavio

Attorney at GOLDEN & CARDONA LOYA LLP

3130 Bonita Rd #200B

Chula Vista, CA 91910

Defendant Attorneys

Eley, Hunter R

Jacobs, Kurtiss A

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Macdonald, Pamela J. Refers to: Capital One Bank USA NA; Hunt & Henriques

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Macdonald, Pamela J. Refers to: Capital One Bank USA NA; Hunt & Henriques

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Macdonald, Pamela J. Refers to: Capital One Bank USA NA; Hunt & Henriques

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Personal Service - Petition

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Macdonald, Pamela J. Refers to: Hunt & Henriques

Proof of Personal Service - Petition

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Macdonald, Pamela J. Refers to: Capital One Bank USA NA

Hunt & Henriques, LLP's Answer

Answer filed by Hunt & Henriques LLP.

Answer

Answer filed by Capital One Bank USA NA.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Capital One Bank USA NA.; Filed By: Capital One Bank USA NA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Hunt & Henriques LLP.; Filed By: Hunt & Henriques LLP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Macdonald, Pamela J. Refers to: Capital One Bank USA NA; Filed By: Macdonald, Pamela J (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Macdonald, Pamela J. Refers to: Hunt & Henriques; Filed By: Macdonald, Pamela J (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/06/2023 at 02:00:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Macdonald, Pamela J. Refers to: Capital One Bank USA NA; Hunt & Henriques; Filed By: Macdonald, Pamela J (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Macdonald, Pamela J. Refers to: Capital One Bank USA NA; Hunt & Henriques; Filed By: Macdonald, Pamela J (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Macdonald, Pamela J. Refers to: Capital One Bank USA NA; Hunt & Henriques; Hunt & Henriques LLP; Filed By: Macdonald, Pamela J (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hunt & Henriques Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cardona Loya II, Octavio