This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 21:04:44 (UTC).

Macalma vs Wong

Case Summary

On 05/03/2019 Macalma filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Wong. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Macalma, Reynaldo

Wong, Andy ; DBA : Andy's Homework

Wong, Andy ; DBA : Andy's Home Work

Macalma, Salud ; ESA : Salud, Spouses

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Business Alliance Insurance Company

Wong, Andy ; DBA : Andy's Home Work

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Contreras, Dolores

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MOSQUEDA, ROMAN P

Knock, Rick H

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Contreras, Dolores

MOSQUEDA, ROMAN P

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Wong, Andy. Refers to: Macalma, Reynaldo

Answer

Answer (with proof of service) filed by Macalma, Reynaldo; Macalma, Salud.

Order After Hearing

Order After Hearing (Order Granting Motion to Consolidate Cases) filed by Macalma, Reynaldo.

Order - Other

Order - Other (STIP AND ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF SMALL CLAIMS ACTION AND CACATING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASE- DENIED) filed by Macalma, Reynaldo.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 07/12/2019 01:30:00 PM.

Defendant Andy Wong's Answer To Unverified Cross-Complaint of Business Alliance Insurance Company

Answer filed by Wong, Andy.

Answer

Answer filed by Business Alliance Insurance Company.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Business Alliance Insurance Company. Refers to: Wong, Andy

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Business Alliance Insurance Company.

Answer

Answer filed by Wong, Andy.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Wong, Andy. Refers to: Macalma, Reynaldo; Salud, Spouses

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Refers to: Business Alliance Insurance Company

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Andy Wong dba Andys Home Work) filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Refers to: Wong, Andy

Complaint

Complaint filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Refers to: Wong, Andy; Business Alliance Insurance Company

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Refers to: Wong, Andy; Business Alliance Insurance Company

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Refers to: Wong, Andy; Business Alliance Insurance Company

Motion to Consolidate Cases

Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Macalma, Reynaldo.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (with proof of service) filed by Macalma, Reynaldo; Macalma, Salud. Filed By: Macalma, Reynaldo (Cross - Defendant); Macalma, Salud (Cross - Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketCases consolidated on 07/22/2019. 37-2019-00022940-CU-BC-CTL is designated the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Wong, Andy. Refers to: Macalma, Reynaldo Filed By: Wong, Andy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketCases consolidated on 07/15/2019. 37-2018-00003662-CU-BT-CTL is designated the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/04/2019 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder After Hearing (Order Granting Motion to Consolidate Cases) filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Filed By: Macalma, Reynaldo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 07/12/2019 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (STIP AND ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF SMALL CLAIMS ACTION AND CACATING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASE- DENIED) filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Filed By: Macalma, Reynaldo (Cross - Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Wong, Andy. Filed By: Wong, Andy (Cross - Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Andy Wong dba Andys Home Work) filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Refers to: Wong, Andy Filed By: Macalma, Reynaldo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Consolidate Cases filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Filed By: Macalma, Reynaldo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 07/12/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/04/2019 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Refers to: Wong, Andy; Business Alliance Insurance Company Filed By: Macalma, Reynaldo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Refers to: Wong, Andy; Business Alliance Insurance Company Filed By: Macalma, Reynaldo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Refers to: Wong, Andy; Business Alliance Insurance Company Filed By: Macalma, Reynaldo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less