This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 21:04:44 (UTC).

Macalma vs Wong

Case Summary

On 05/03/2019 Macalma filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Wong. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Macalma, Reynaldo

Wong, Andy ; DBA : Andy's Homework

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Business Alliance Insurance Company

Wong, Andy ; DBA : Andy's Home Work

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Macalma, Reynaldo

Wong, Andy ; DBA : Andy's Home Work

Salud, Spouses

Macalma, Salud ; ESA : Salud, Spouses

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Contreras, Dolores

Attorney at CONTRERAS LAW

402 W Broadway Suite 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MOSQUEDA, ROMAN P

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROMAN MOSQUEDA

7136 Haskell Avenue 302

Van Nuys, CA 91406

Knock, Rick H

Attorney at CLEMENTS & KNOCK LLP

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Contreras, Dolores

Attorney at CONTRERAS LAW

402 W Broadway Suite 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

MOSQUEDA, ROMAN P

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROMAN MOSQUEDA

7136 Haskell Avenue 302

Van Nuys, CA 91406

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Wong, Andy. Refers to: Macalma, Reynaldo

Answer

Answer (with proof of service) filed by Macalma, Reynaldo; Macalma, Salud.

Order After Hearing

Order After Hearing (Order Granting Motion to Consolidate Cases) filed by Macalma, Reynaldo.

Order - Other

Order - Other (STIP AND ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF SMALL CLAIMS ACTION AND CACATING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASE- DENIED) filed by Macalma, Reynaldo.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 07/12/2019 01:30:00 PM.

Defendant Andy Wong's Answer To Unverified Cross-Complaint of Business Alliance Insurance Company

Answer filed by Wong, Andy.

Answer

Answer filed by Business Alliance Insurance Company.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Business Alliance Insurance Company. Refers to: Wong, Andy

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Business Alliance Insurance Company.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Wong, Andy. Refers to: Macalma, Reynaldo; Salud, Spouses

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Refers to: Business Alliance Insurance Company

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Andy Wong dba Andys Home Work) filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Refers to: Wong, Andy

Complaint

Complaint filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Refers to: Wong, Andy; Business Alliance Insurance Company

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Refers to: Wong, Andy; Business Alliance Insurance Company

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Refers to: Wong, Andy; Business Alliance Insurance Company

Motion to Consolidate Cases

Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Macalma, Reynaldo.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer (with proof of service) filed by Macalma, Reynaldo; Macalma, Salud. Filed By: Macalma, Reynaldo (Cross - Defendant); Macalma, Salud (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Cases consolidated on 07/22/2019. 37-2019-00022940-CU-BC-CTL is designated the lead case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Wong, Andy. Refers to: Macalma, Reynaldo Filed By: Wong, Andy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Cases consolidated on 07/15/2019. 37-2018-00003662-CU-BT-CTL is designated the lead case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/04/2019 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order After Hearing (Order Granting Motion to Consolidate Cases) filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Filed By: Macalma, Reynaldo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 07/12/2019 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (STIP AND ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF SMALL CLAIMS ACTION AND CACATING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASE- DENIED) filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Filed By: Macalma, Reynaldo (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Wong, Andy. Filed By: Wong, Andy (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Andy Wong dba Andys Home Work) filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Refers to: Wong, Andy Filed By: Macalma, Reynaldo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Filed By: Macalma, Reynaldo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 07/12/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/04/2019 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Refers to: Wong, Andy; Business Alliance Insurance Company Filed By: Macalma, Reynaldo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Refers to: Wong, Andy; Business Alliance Insurance Company Filed By: Macalma, Reynaldo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Macalma, Reynaldo. Refers to: Wong, Andy; Business Alliance Insurance Company Filed By: Macalma, Reynaldo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOSQUEDA ROMAN P.