This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 09:22:51 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions vs. Hemphill

Case Summary

On 04/30/2012 LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Hemphill. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions

Defendant

Hemphill, Tracy C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brachfeld, Erica L

Attorney at THE BRACHFELD LAW GROUP PC

880 Apollo St Suite 336

El Segundo, CA 90245

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions. Refers to: Hemphill, Tracy

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions. Refers to: Hemphill, Tracy

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions. Refers to: Hemphill, Tracy

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of jurisdictional facts) filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions. Refers to: Hemphill, Tracy

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions. Refers to: Hemphill, Tracy

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions. Refers to: Hemphill, Tracy

Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk

Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions. Refers to: Hemphill, Tracy

Judgment by Default by Clerk

Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions. Refers to: Hemphill, Tracy

abstract

Abstract of Judgment issued.

writ

Writ of Execution issued.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions. Refers to: Hemphill, Tracy

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions. Filed By: LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions. Refers to: Hemphill, Tracy Filed By: LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Abstract of Judgment issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions and against Hemphill, Tracy C for $ 24712.07, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 2315.49, prejudgment costs: $ 441.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 27468.56.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • The default filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions was entered as to Hemphill, Tracy C on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 . Override feature used.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of Does filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions. Refers to: Hemphill, Tracy Filed By: LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (of jurisdictional facts) filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions. Refers to: Hemphill, Tracy Filed By: LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • Case assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions. Refers to: Hemphill, Tracy Filed By: LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions. Refers to: Hemphill, Tracy Filed By: LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions. Refers to: Hemphill, Tracy Filed By: LVNV Funding LLC assignee of Credit One Financial Solutions (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.