Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/25/2020 at 20:29:57 (UTC).

Luhman vs Luhman

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 Luhman filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Luhman. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Luhman, Sue

Respondents

Luhman, Michell

Luhman, Michele

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/15/2020 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 01/15/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-61 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAffidavit - Other (unsuccessful service) filed by Luhman, Sue. Filed By: Luhman, Sue (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse heard 12/16/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Luhman, Sue. Filed By: Luhman, Sue (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Luhman, Sue. Refers to: Luhman, Michele Filed By: Luhman, Sue (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Luhman, Sue. Refers to: Luhman, Michele Filed By: Luhman, Sue (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Luhman, Sue. Filed By: Luhman, Sue (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Luhman, Sue. Filed By: Luhman, Sue (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse scheduled for 12/16/2019 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-61 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketOrder for Removal from Residence filed by Luhman, Sue. Filed By: Luhman, Sue (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less