Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/02/2021 at 05:59:45 (UTC).

Lucia Guzman vs. William Camilo Hyden Souza

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 Lucia Guzman filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against William Camilo Hyden Souza. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Guzman, Lucia

Defendant

Souza, William Camilo Hyden

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 04/21/2020 at 08:00:00 AM at Central in C-63 was vacated.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

Request for Reset of Small Claims Trial - Initial

Request for Reset of Small Claims Trial - Initial filed by Guzman, Lucia.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Small Claims Court Trial was rescheduled to 01/11/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in C-63 before at Central.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 01/11/2021 01:30:00 PM.

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Guzman, Lucia. Refers to: Souza, William

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 01/11/2021 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Small Claims Court Trial was rescheduled to 01/11/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in C-63 before at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 01/11/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-63 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Reset of Small Claims Trial - Initial filed by Guzman, Lucia. Filed By: Guzman, Lucia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 12/07/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-63 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 04/21/2020 at 08:00:00 AM at Central in C-63 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Guzman, Lucia. Refers to: Souza, William Filed By: Guzman, Lucia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 04/21/2020 at 08:00:00 AM at Central in C-63 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less