This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 02:40:24 (UTC).

Lucero-Sanchez vs Deepika

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 Lucero-Sanchez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Deepika. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lucero-Sanchez, Abigail

Defendants

Deepika, Fnu Ramesh

Bhatnoojaday, Krishna

Krishna Raghavendra, Bhat Noojday; ESA : Bhatnoojaday, Krishna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mabasa, Kiara M

2801 Cahuenga Blvd W

Los Angeles, CA 90068

Faraj, Haytham

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF HAYTHAM FARAJ

8605 Santa Monica Boulevard 44953

West Hollywood, CA 90069

Defendant Attorneys

Aros, Lauren A

Reeves, Sheryl Lee

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Lucero-Sanchez, Abigail. Refers to: Deepika, Fnu; Bhatnoojaday, Krishna

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Lucero-Sanchez, Abigail. Refers to: Deepika, Fnu; Bhatnoojaday, Krishna

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lucero-Sanchez, Abigail. Refers to: Deepika, Fnu; Bhatnoojaday, Krishna

Complaint

Complaint filed by Lucero-Sanchez, Abigail. Refers to: Deepika, Fnu; Bhatnoojaday, Krishna

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 04/22/2021 at 10:30:00 AM in C-65 before Ronald F. Frazier at Central.

Answer

Answer filed by Deepika, Fnu Ramesh; Krishna Raghavendra, Bhat Noojday.

Notice - Other (Notices)

Notice - Other (OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL) filed by Deepika, Fnu Ramesh; Krishna Raghavendra, Bhat Noojday.

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney (Participant Information)

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Deepika, Fnu Ramesh; Krishna Raghavendra, Bhat Noojday.

Association of Attorney

Association of Attorney filed by Lucero-Sanchez, Abigail.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/22/2021 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Deepika, Fnu Ramesh; Krishna Raghavendra, Bhat Noojday.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Deepika, Fnu Ramesh; Krishna Raghavendra, Bhat Noojday.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Lucero-Sanchez, Abigail.

Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Deepika, Fnu Ramesh; Krishna Raghavendra, Bhat Noojday.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL) filed by Deepika, Fnu Ramesh; Krishna Raghavendra, Bhat Noojday. Filed By: Deepika, Fnu Ramesh (Defendant); Krishna Raghavendra, Bhat Noojday (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Deepika, Fnu Ramesh; Krishna Raghavendra, Bhat Noojday. Filed By: Deepika, Fnu Ramesh (Defendant); Krishna Raghavendra, Bhat Noojday (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney filed by Lucero-Sanchez, Abigail. Filed By: Lucero-Sanchez, Abigail (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 03/04/2022 at 09:45AM before Judge Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 02/18/2022 at 10:00AM before Judge Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/22/2021 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Deepika, Fnu Ramesh; Krishna Raghavendra, Bhat Noojday. Filed By: Deepika, Fnu Ramesh (Defendant); Krishna Raghavendra, Bhat Noojday (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Deepika, Fnu Ramesh; Krishna Raghavendra, Bhat Noojday. Filed By: Deepika, Fnu Ramesh (Defendant); Krishna Raghavendra, Bhat Noojday (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/22/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Deepika, Fnu Ramesh; Krishna Raghavendra, Bhat Noojday. Filed By: Deepika, Fnu Ramesh (Defendant); Krishna Raghavendra, Bhat Noojday (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/23/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Lucero-Sanchez, Abigail. Refers to: Deepika, Fnu; Krishna Raghavendra, Bhat Filed By: Lucero-Sanchez, Abigail (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lucero-Sanchez, Abigail. Refers to: Deepika, Fnu; Krishna Raghavendra, Bhat Filed By: Lucero-Sanchez, Abigail (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Lucero-Sanchez, Abigail. Refers to: Deepika, Fnu; Krishna Raghavendra, Bhat Filed By: Lucero-Sanchez, Abigail (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Lucero-Sanchez, Abigail. Refers to: Deepika, Fnu; Krishna Raghavendra, Bhat Filed By: Lucero-Sanchez, Abigail (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer .MABASA, KIARA M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Faraj, Haytham