This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/27/2020 at 03:39:36 (UTC).

Lozada Bedford vs Brown

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Lozada Bedford filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Brown. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lozada Bedford, Annett S

Defendants

Brown, Billy Kirk

Brown, Donna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arter, Lee C

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Lozada Bedford, Annett S.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Lozada Bedford, Annett S. Refers to: Brown, Billy; Brown, Donna

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lozada Bedford, Annett S. Refers to: Brown, Billy; Brown, Donna

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Lozada Bedford, Annett S. Refers to: Brown, Billy; Brown, Donna

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/18/2020 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Lozada Bedford, Annett S. Filed By: Lozada Bedford, Annett S (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Brown, Billy Kirk .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Brown, Donna .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Lozada Bedford, Annett S .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Lozada Bedford, Annett S. Refers to: Brown, Billy; Brown, Donna Filed By: Lozada Bedford, Annett S (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Lozada Bedford, Annett S. Refers to: Brown, Billy; Brown, Donna Filed By: Lozada Bedford, Annett S (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lozada Bedford, Annett S. Refers to: Brown, Billy; Brown, Donna Filed By: Lozada Bedford, Annett S (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/18/2020 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.