Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/10/2021 at 08:39:28 (UTC).

Los Angeles Federal Credit Union VS Parsons

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 Los Angeles Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Parsons. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Los Angeles Federal Credit Union

Defendant

PARSONS, DAVID ARTHUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anaya, Alana B

Attorney at ANAYA LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union. Refers to: PARSONS, DAVID

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union. Refers to: PARSONS, DAVID

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union. Refers to: PARSONS, DAVID

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union. Refers to: PARSONS, DAVID

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union. Refers to: PARSONS, DAVID

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union. Filed By: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to PARSONS, DAVID ARTHUR .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Los Angeles Federal Credit Union.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union. Refers to: PARSONS, DAVID Filed By: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union. Refers to: PARSONS, DAVID Filed By: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union. Refers to: PARSONS, DAVID Filed By: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union. Refers to: PARSONS, DAVID Filed By: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union. Refers to: PARSONS, DAVID Filed By: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant