This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/31/2022 at 11:18:54 (UTC).

Los Angeles Federal Credit Union vs Cook

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 Los Angeles Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Cook. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew C. Braner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Matthew C. Braner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Los Angeles Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Cook, Nathan David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anaya, Alana B

Attorney at ANAYA LAW GROUP

2629 Townsgate Rd Ste 140

Westlake Village, CA 91361

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union. Refers to: Cook, Nathan

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union. Refers to: Cook, Nathan

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union. Refers to: Cook, Nathan

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-60; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union.; Filed By: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/18/2022 at 11:15:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Braner, Matthew.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union. Refers to: Cook, Nathan; Filed By: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union. Refers to: Cook, Nathan; Filed By: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union. Refers to: Cook, Nathan; Filed By: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant