This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/15/2022 at 07:03:57 (UTC).

Lopez vs Volkswagen Group of America Inc

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 Lopez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Volkswagen Group of America Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew C. Braner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Matthew C. Braner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lopez, Adolfo Torres

Defendant

Volkswagen Group of America Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Morrow, Neal F III

5318 2Nd St #490

Long Beach, CA 90803

Defendant Attorney

Bravo, Eduardo A

555 S Flower Street 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Lopez, Adolfo Torres. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lopez, Adolfo Torres. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Lopez, Adolfo Torres. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Lopez, Adolfo Torres. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other filed by Volkswagen Group of America Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-60; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Volkswagen Group of America Inc.; Filed By: Volkswagen Group of America Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Lopez, Adolfo Torres. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc; Filed By: Lopez, Adolfo Torres (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Braner, Matthew.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Lopez, Adolfo Torres. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc; Filed By: Lopez, Adolfo Torres (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lopez, Adolfo Torres. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc; Filed By: Lopez, Adolfo Torres (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Lopez, Adolfo Torres. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc; Filed By: Lopez, Adolfo Torres (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less