Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/11/2021 at 04:08:12 (UTC).

Long vs Valentine

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Long filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Valentine. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Long, William

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Zoes Dog Training

Valentine, Ashley

Lu, Yvonne

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Lu, Yvonne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Morse, Richard P. III

Attorney at INJURY TRIAL LAWYERS APC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FRESCH, ELAINE KATHERINE

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

Case, Anthony T.

Attorney at FARMER CASE & FEDOR

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Case, Anthony T.

Attorney at FARMER CASE & FEDOR

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Extend Time For Cross-Defendant Yvonne Lu to Respond to Ashley Valentine s Cross-Complaint

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Extend time to Respond to Cross Complaint) filed by Lu, Yvonne; Valentine, Ashley.

Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time for Cross Defendant Yvonne Lu to Respond to Ashley Valentine s Cross Complaint

Order - Other (Granting Stipulation) filed by Lu, Yvonne.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Valentine, Ashley.

Cross-Complaint (First Papers)

Cross-Complaint filed by Valentine, Ashley. Refers to: Lu, Yvonne

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons (On Cross-Complaint) filed by Valentine, Ashley. Refers to: Lu, Yvonne

PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Complaint filed by Long, William. Refers to: Valentine, Ashley; Lu, Yvonne; Zoes Dog Training

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Long, William. Refers to: Valentine, Ashley; Lu, Yvonne; Zoes Dog Training

SUMMONS

Original Summons filed by Long, William. Refers to: Valentine, Ashley; Lu, Yvonne; Zoes Dog Training

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Granting Stipulation) filed by Lu, Yvonne. Filed By: Lu, Yvonne (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Extend time to Respond to Cross Complaint) filed by Lu, Yvonne; Valentine, Ashley. Filed By: Lu, Yvonne (Defendant); Valentine, Ashley (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Valentine, Ashley. Filed By: Valentine, Ashley (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Valentine, Ashley. Refers to: Lu, Yvonne Filed By: Valentine, Ashley (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons (On Cross-Complaint) filed by Valentine, Ashley. Refers to: Lu, Yvonne Filed By: Valentine, Ashley (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/28/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Long, William. Refers to: Valentine, Ashley; Lu, Yvonne; Zoes Dog Training Filed By: Long, William (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Long, William. Refers to: Valentine, Ashley; Lu, Yvonne; Zoes Dog Training Filed By: Long, William (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Long, William. Refers to: Valentine, Ashley; Lu, Yvonne; Zoes Dog Training Filed By: Long, William (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASE ANTHONY T.