This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/18/2021 at 07:27:28 (UTC).

Lobel Financial Corp vs. Washeta N Amore

Case Summary

On 09/19/2011 Lobel Financial Corp filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Washeta N Amore. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP

Defendant

AMORE, WASHETA N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN, RONALD J JR

1150 N Magnolia Ave

Anaheim, CA 92801

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/10/2012 10:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/10/2012 at 10:00:00 AM at East County in E-21 .

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service (Renewal of Judgment)

Proof of Service filed by Lobel Financial Corp.

Renewal of Judgment - Notice

Renewal of Judgment - Notice (Date Issued: 06/09/2021) filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Refers to: Amore, Washeta

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Interest: 3889.48) filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Refers to: Amore, Washeta

Renewal of Judgment - Application for Entry

Renewal of Judgment - Application for Entry (Renewal Amount: $8185.29) filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Refers to: Amore, Washeta

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Filed By: Lobel Financial Corp (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRenewal of Judgment - Application for Entry (Renewal Amount: $8185.29) filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Refers to: Amore, Washeta Filed By: Lobel Financial Corp (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Interest: 3889.48) filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Refers to: Amore, Washeta Filed By: Lobel Financial Corp (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRenewal of Judgment - Notice (Date Issued: 06/09/2021) filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Refers to: Amore, Washeta Filed By: Lobel Financial Corp (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Amore, Washeta N, on 11/29/2011, has expired.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • DocketCivil Court Trial scheduled for 05/04/2012 at 01:30:00 PM at East County in E-21 was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2012
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Filed By: Lobel Financial Corp (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2012
  • DocketStipulation for Entry of Judgment filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Refers to: Amore, Washeta Filed By: Lobel Financial Corp (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2012
  • DocketJudgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Lobel Financial Corp and against Amore, Washeta N for $ 3023.01, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 300.00, interest: $ 647.80, prejudgment costs: $ 280.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 4250.81.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/10/2012 at 10:00:00 AM at East County in E-21 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • DocketProof of Service (ANSWER) filed by Amore, Washeta N. Refers to: Lobel Financial Corp Filed By: Amore, Washeta N (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2011
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Amore, Washeta N. Filed By: Amore, Washeta N (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2011
  • DocketAnswer filed by Amore, Washeta N. Refers to: Lobel Financial Corp Filed By: Amore, Washeta N (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2011
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Refers to: Amore, Washeta Filed By: Lobel Financial Corp (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Lobel Financial Corp.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lobel Financial Corp.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • DocketCase assigned to Department E-21.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN, RONALD J, Jr.