This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 01:02:58 (UTC).

Lobel Financial Corp vs. Valenzuela

Case Summary

On 10/12/2012 Lobel Financial Corp filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Valenzuela. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-EC

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lobel Financial Corp

Defendant

Valenzuela, Ana I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lobel, Gary Dean

1150 N Magnolia Ave

Anaheim, CA 92801

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Refers to: Valenzuela, Ana

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Refers to: Valenzuela, Ana

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Lobel Financial Corp.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Refers to: Valenzuela, Ana

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Refers to: Valenzuela, Ana

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (andApplication Approved as to Form Only) filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Refers to: Valenzuela, Ana

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does (1-10) filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Refers to: Valenzuela, Ana

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Refers to: Valenzuela, Ana

Judgment by Default by Court

Judgment by Default by Court filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Refers to: Valenzuela, Ana

Notice to Filing Party SD

[Another document for ROA# 19]

Application for Entry of Judgment

Application for Entry of Judgment submitted by Lobel Financial Corp rejected on 12/13/2013. Refers to: Valenzuela, Ana

Abstract of Judgment issued

Abstract of Judgment issued.

Writ of Execution issued

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Lobel Financial Corp.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Filed By: Lobel Financial Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Abstract of Judgment issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Application for Entry of Judgment submitted by Lobel Financial Corp rejected on 12/13/2013. Refers to: Valenzuela, Ana Filed By: Lobel Financial Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 19]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • *****WRIT RECEIVED*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Lobel Financial Corp and against Valenzuela, Ana I for $ 5111.56, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 510.00, interest: $ 619.53, prejudgment costs: $ 280.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 6521.09.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Court filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Refers to: Valenzuela, Ana Filed By: Lobel Financial Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • Default Court Judgment Documents: Forwarded to East County Dept 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Refers to: Valenzuela, Ana Filed By: Lobel Financial Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2013
  • ** DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT RECEIVED **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • ** DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT RECEIVED **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Service filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Refers to: Valenzuela, Ana Filed By: Lobel Financial Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Refers to: Valenzuela, Ana Filed By: Lobel Financial Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Filed By: Lobel Financial Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Refers to: Valenzuela, Ana Filed By: Lobel Financial Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Lobel Financial Corp. Refers to: Valenzuela, Ana Filed By: Lobel Financial Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.