This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/12/2018 at 23:09:12 (UTC).

Lizarraga vs PMCCA Inc

Case Summary

On 10/01/2015 Lizarraga filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PMCCA Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY TAYLOR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

TIMOTHY TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIZARRAGA, CARLOS

Defendants

PMCCA INC

RIOS, IGNACIO

DOLLENTE, ERIC

PINATELLO, PEDRO

PMCCA INC; DBA : PERFORMANCE MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS;ESA : PMC

PMC INC; DBA : PERFORMANCE MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS;AKA : PMCCA;ESA : PMC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REYES, JORGE H

Attorney at REYES & ASSOCIATES PC

3055 Wilshire Boulevard 600

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorney

LECRONE, JOHN P

Attorney at DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE LLP

Tcw Tower, 865 S Figueroa St

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2566

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Cause of Actions 3 and 7 only

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Cause of Actions (NOT ENTERED) filed by Lizarraga, Carlos.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation and Protective Order) filed by Lizarraga, Carlos; PMCCA Inc.

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by PMCCA Inc.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (of continuance of hearing) filed by PMCCA Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (of Motion to Be Relieved As Counsel on PMCCA, Inc) filed by PMCCA Inc.

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed by PMCCA Inc.

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by PMCCA Inc.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint filed by Lizarraga, Carlos. Refers to: PMCCA Inc

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 09/16/2016 01:30:00 PM.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (of Entry of Order) filed by PMC Inc.

Proof of Service of Summons on PMC Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Lizarraga, Carlos. Refers to: PMC Inc

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Lizarraga, Carlos.

Request for Entry of Default for PMC Inc

Request for Entry of Default filed by Lizarraga, Carlos. Refers to: Pinatello, Pedro

Request for Entry of Default of Ignacio Rios

Request for Entry of Default filed by Lizarraga, Carlos. Refers to: Rios, Ignacio

Request for Entry of Default of Eric Dollente

Request for Entry of Default filed by Lizarraga, Carlos. Refers to: Dollente, Eric

Request for Entry of Default of Pedro Pinatello

Request for Entry of Default (NOT ENTERED) filed by Lizarraga, Carlos. Refers to: PMC Inc

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 02/03/2017 09:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 02/10/2017 09:00:00 AM.

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Lizarraga, Carlos. Refers to: Dollente, Eric; Rios, Ignacio; Pinatello, Pedro; PMCCA Inc; PMC Inc Filed By: Lizarraga, Carlos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 02/10/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Civil Jury Trial set for 02/17/2017 at 08:30AM vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 02/03/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) continued pursuant to Court's motion to 02/10/2017 at 09:00AM before Judge Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Default entered as to Pinatello, Pedro on Complaint filed by Lizarraga, Carlos .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Default entered as to Rios, Ignacio on Complaint filed by Lizarraga, Carlos .

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Ignacio Rios) filed by Lizarraga, Carlos. Refers to: Rios, Ignacio Filed By: Lizarraga, Carlos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Eric Dollente) filed by Lizarraga, Carlos. Refers to: Dollente, Eric Filed By: Lizarraga, Carlos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Pedro Pinatello) filed by Lizarraga, Carlos. Refers to: Pinatello, Pedro Filed By: Lizarraga, Carlos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/04/2016 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Lizarraga, Carlos. Refers to: PMCCA Inc; PMCCA Inc; Dollente, Eric; Rios, Ignacio; Pinatello, Pedro Filed By: Lizarraga, Carlos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lizarraga, Carlos. Refers to: PMCCA Inc; PMCCA Inc; Dollente, Eric; Rios, Ignacio; Pinatello, Pedro Filed By: Lizarraga, Carlos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Lizarraga, Carlos. Refers to: PMCCA Inc; PMC Inc; Dollente, Eric; Rios, Ignacio; Pinatello, Pedro Filed By: Lizarraga, Carlos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PMC (Nova Scotia) Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LECRONE JOHN P. ESQ.