This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 01:53:01 (UTC).

Lipton vs Palpant

Case Summary

On 03/18/2016 Lipton filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Palpant. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EARL H. MAAS, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EARL H. MAAS, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SEALE, ERIKA

LIPTON, GREGORY

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SONG H. RAMBOLDT, AS TRUSTEE OF THE SONG RAMBOLDT LIVING TRUST

PALPANT, DAVID

PCP-OCEANSIDE LP; DBA : OCEANSIDE RV PARK

WESTCOAST TIRE & WHEEL INC

M A CIRILLO & ASSOCIATES; DBA : STAR MOBILEHOME PARK MANAGEMENT

CITY OF OCEANSIDE

CIRILLO, MICHAEL A.

PCP-OCEANSIDE, LP; DBA : OCEANSIDE RV PARK

SCOTT BAILEY TRUSTEE OF THE BAILEY DECEMBER 4, 2007 FAMILY TRUST; ESA : SCOTT BAILEY, TRUSTEE OF THE BAILEY 2007 TRUST

RETHMEIER, ROGER

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALEXANDER, PHILIP C

301 Mission Ave #203

Oceanside, CA 92054

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

STOFFEL, JAMES JAY

7676 Hazard Center Drive 850

San Diego, CA 92108

PASKOWITZ, MICHAEL A

Attorney at WINET PATRICK GAYER CREIGHTON & HANES

701 B Street 1275

San Diego, CA 92101

ELLROD, ANTHONY

Attorney at MANNING & KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ TRESTER LLP

550 W C 19Th Floor Street

San Diego, CA 92101

BRACK, LINDSAY R

Attorney at BRACK & MASON

1495 Pacific Highway 375

San Diego, CA 92101

RYAN, NORMAN A

Attorney at RYAN CARVALHO LLP

8989 Rio San Diego Drive 368

San Diego, CA 92108

MULLEN, JOHN P

Attorney at CITY OF OCEANSIDE CITY ATTORNEY S OFFICE

City Hall - South, 300 N Coast Hwy

Oceanside, CA 92054

NASH, DEBORAH

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CITY ATTORNEY

City Hall - South, 300 N Coast Hwy

Oceanside, CA 92054

JOHNSON, GREGG A

12526 High Bluff Drive Ste 300

San Diego, CA 92130

 

Court Documents

Declaration of T. Steven Burke in Support of Oceanside's Opposition to West Coast Tire and Wheel, Inc.'s Motion for Good Faith Determination

Declaration - Other filed by CITY OF OCEANSIDE.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (11/09/2017) filed by Palpant, David.

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (ROA 36)

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (ROE 1) filed by CITY OF OCEANSIDE. Refers to: Scott Bailey Trustee of The Bailey December 4, 2007 Family Trust

Request for Dismissal as to Song Ramboldt

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Seale, Erika; Lipton, Gregory. Refers to: SONG H. RAMBOLDT, as Trustee of THE SONG RAMBOLDT LIVING TRUST

Declaration Re Proof of Service

Proof of Service (04/06/2018) filed by Song H. Ramboldt, as Trustee of the Song Ramboldt Living Trust.

Answer of Star Management to Complaint for Damages

Answer filed by M A Cirillo & Associates.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (by Messenger Service - Reply Brief in support of MSJ) filed by PCP-OCEANSIDE, LP; M A Cirillo & Associates.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/17/2016 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by SONG H. RAMBOLDT, as Trustee of THE SONG RAMBOLDT LIVING TRUST.

PCP Oceanside Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion to Amend Cross Complaint

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (3/3/17) filed by PCP-Oceanside LP.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by SONG H. RAMBOLDT, as Trustee of THE SONG RAMBOLDT LIVING TRUST.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Seale, Erika; Lipton, Gregory.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 10/02/2017 08:30:00 AM.

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (3/3 MTN FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER) filed by Lipton, Gregory; Seale, Erika.

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 02/24/2017 01:30:00 PM.

PCP Oceanside Proof of Service on Motion for Leave to Amend

Proof of Service (3/3/17) filed by PCP-Oceanside LP.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Scott Bailey Trustee of The Bailey December 4, 2007 Family Trust; WESTCOAST TIRE & WHEEL INC.

355 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by SONG H. RAMBOLDT, as Trustee of THE SONG RAMBOLDT LIVING TRUST. Filed By: SONG H. RAMBOLDT, as Trustee of THE SONG RAMBOLDT LIVING TRUST (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to Opposition - Other filed by SONG H. RAMBOLDT, as Trustee of THE SONG RAMBOLDT LIVING TRUST. Filed By: SONG H. RAMBOLDT, as Trustee of THE SONG RAMBOLDT LIVING TRUST (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Court Vacating Dates In Non-Lead Case SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Cases consolidated on 03/23/2018. 37-2016-00009016-CU-PO-NC is designated the lead case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 10/05/2018 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 11/02/2018 at 09:15:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 04/20/2018 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • The Demurrer / Motion to Strike was rescheduled to 04/20/2018 at 01:30:00 PM in N-28 before Earl H. Maas at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 11/02/2018 at 09:15AM before Judge Earl H. Maas, III.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Pursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    Read MoreRead Less
464 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Seale, Erika; Lipton, Gregory. Refers to: SONG H. RAMBOLDT, as Trustee of THE SONG RAMBOLDT LIVING TRUST Filed By: Seale, Erika (Plaintiff); Lipton, Gregory (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Seale, Erika; Lipton, Gregory. Refers to: PCP-OCEANSIDE, LP Filed By: Seale, Erika (Plaintiff); Lipton, Gregory (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Seale, Erika; Lipton, Gregory. Refers to: Palpant, David Filed By: Seale, Erika (Plaintiff); Lipton, Gregory (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/14/2016 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Lipton, Gregory; Seale, Erika. Refers to: Palpant, David; PCP-OCEANSIDE, LP; SONG H. RAMBOLDT, as Trustee of THE SONG RAMBOLDT LIVING TRUST Filed By: Lipton, Gregory (Plaintiff); Seale, Erika (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lipton, Gregory; Seale, Erika. Refers to: Palpant, David; PCP-OCEANSIDE, LP; SONG H. RAMBOLDT, as Trustee of THE SONG RAMBOLDT LIVING TRUST Filed By: Lipton, Gregory (Plaintiff); Seale, Erika (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Lipton, Gregory; Seale, Erika. Refers to: Palpant, David; PCP-OCEANSIDE, LP; SONG H. RAMBOLDT, as Trustee of THE SONG RAMBOLDT LIVING TRUST; Westcoast Tire & Wheel Inc; CITY OF OCEANSIDE; Scott Bailey Trustee of The Bailey December 4, 2007 Family Trust; M A Cirillo & Associates; Cirillo, Michael Filed By: Lipton, Gregory (Plaintiff); Seale, Erika (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.