This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/30/2021 at 08:04:54 (UTC).

Lindamood vs Ford Motor Company

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 Lindamood filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy Taylor and Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Timothy Taylor

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lindamood, Douglas

Lindamood, Evie

Defendants

Ford Motor Company

North County Ford

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dolin, Tionna

Attorney at STRATEGIC LEGAL PRACTICES APC

Defendant Attorney

Mortenson, Michael

Attorney at MORTENSON TAGGART LLP

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Lindamood, Evie; Lindamood, Douglas.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Lindamood, Evie; Lindamood, Douglas. Refers to: North County Ford

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Lindamood, Evie; Lindamood, Douglas. Refers to: Ford Motor Company; North County Ford

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lindamood, Evie; Lindamood, Douglas. Refers to: Ford Motor Company; North County Ford

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Lindamood, Evie; Lindamood, Douglas. Refers to: Ford Motor Company; North County Ford

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Taylor, Timothy to Richard Whitney effective 07/13/2021

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge filed by Lindamood, Douglas; Lindamood, Evie.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/21/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 01/21/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in C-68 before Richard S. Whitney at Central.

Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Arbitration

Proposed Order (in support of Motion to compel arbitration and stay action) submitted by Ford Motor Company; North County Ford received but not filed on 08/05/2021.

Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration - Other (in support of Motion to compel arbitration and stay action) filed by Ford Motor Company; North County Ford.

Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration

Motion - Other (Motion to compel arbitration and stay action) filed by Ford Motor Company; North County Ford.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 01/21/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 01/21/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in C-68 before Richard S. Whitney at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/21/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - Other (Motion to compel arbitration and stay action) filed by Ford Motor Company; North County Ford. Filed By: Ford Motor Company (Defendant); North County Ford (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (in support of Motion to compel arbitration and stay action) filed by Ford Motor Company; North County Ford. Filed By: Ford Motor Company (Defendant); North County Ford (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order (in support of Motion to compel arbitration and stay action) submitted by Ford Motor Company; North County Ford received but not filed on 08/05/2021. Filed By: Ford Motor Company (Defendant); North County Ford (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/21/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Taylor, Timothy to Richard Whitney effective 07/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge filed by Lindamood, Douglas; Lindamood, Evie. Filed By: Lindamood, Douglas (Plaintiff); Lindamood, Evie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Lindamood, Evie; Lindamood, Douglas. Refers to: North County Ford Filed By: Lindamood, Evie (Plaintiff); Lindamood, Douglas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Lindamood, Evie; Lindamood, Douglas. Filed By: Lindamood, Evie (Plaintiff); Lindamood, Douglas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/10/2021 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Lindamood, Evie; Lindamood, Douglas. Refers to: Ford Motor Company; North County Ford Filed By: Lindamood, Evie (Plaintiff); Lindamood, Douglas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lindamood, Evie; Lindamood, Douglas. Refers to: Ford Motor Company; North County Ford Filed By: Lindamood, Evie (Plaintiff); Lindamood, Douglas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Lindamood, Evie; Lindamood, Douglas. Refers to: Ford Motor Company; North County Ford Filed By: Lindamood, Evie (Plaintiff); Lindamood, Douglas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where North County Ford Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOLIN TIONNA