This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/18/2020 at 08:43:38 (UTC).

Linares vs The Chamberlain Group Inc

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 Linares filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The Chamberlain Group Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Linares, Sidney

Sidney Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares

Linares, Timothy

Timothy Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Flood, Timothy

Gate Masters Inc

Flood, Norma

Reser, Eric ; DBA : Reser's Ornamental Iron

CONTROLLED ENTRANCES INC

The Chamberlain Group Inc; DBA : CGI Inc

Reser, James ; AKA : Reser, Jim;DBA : Reser's Ornamental Iron

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Linares, Sidney

Sidney Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares

Gate Masters Inc

Linares, Timothy

Timothy Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares

Reser, Ralph ; DBA : Reser's Ornamental Iron

Reser, Eric ; DBA : Reser's Ornamental Iron

CONTROLLED ENTRANCES INC

The Chamberlain Group Inc; DBA : CGI Inc

Guardian Ad Litem

Worthington, William

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Guardian Ad Litem Attorneys

Bassirian, Zagros

Neal, S Todd

Neal, Todd

KENNEDY, KEVIN P.

Attorney at KENNEDY & SOUZA APC

Brownwood, Randall L

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SANTA CRUZ CANNON & KOTHARY

Ostin, Penny

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SANTA CRUZ CANNON & KOTHARY

Bradus, Josh

Gosling, Michael F.

Attorney at JONES DAY

Hogan, Carol A

Attorney at JONES DAY

Hodges, Nicholas

Attorney at JONES DAY

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KENNEDY, KEVIN P.

Attorney at KENNEDY & SOUZA APC

Brownwood, Randall L

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SANTA CRUZ CANNON & KOTHARY

Ostin, Penny

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SANTA CRUZ CANNON & KOTHARY

Bradus, Josh

Gosling, Michael F.

Attorney at JONES DAY

Hogan, Carol A

Attorney at JONES DAY

Hodges, Nicholas

Attorney at JONES DAY

Oberrecht, Kimberly S

Attorney at HORTON OBERRECHT KIRKPATRICK & MARTHA

 

Court Documents

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Paula Rahn - CSR# 11510 - Granted) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Keren Guevara - CSR# 12478 - Granted) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 07/17/2020 11:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling filed by Linares, Sidney; Sidney Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares; Linares, Timothy; Timothy Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Settlement Conference (Civil) heard 07/30/2020 09:30:00 AM. (Subsequently amended - See ROA # 197)

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Settlement Conference (Civil) heard 07/30/2020 09:30:00 AM. (As Amended)

Notice - Other

Notice of Appearance filed by The Chamberlain Group Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by The Chamberlain Group Inc.

Petition to Approve Minor's Compromise

Petition to Approve Compromise of Claim of Minor or Adult Person with Disability (Subsequent Petition) filed by Linares, Sidney; Sidney Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares; Linares, Timothy; Timothy Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Linares, Sidney; Sidney Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares; Linares, Timothy; Timothy Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares.

Order Approving Compromise of Claim of Minor

Order Approving Compromise of Claim of Minor or Adult Person with Disability (Order signed 08/03/2020) filed by Linares, Sidney; Sidney Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares; Linares, Timothy; Timothy Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Linares, Sidney; Sidney Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares; Linares, Timothy; Timothy Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares.

Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay

Ex Parte Application for Stay filed by The Chamberlain Group Inc.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by The Chamberlain Group Inc.

Declaration of Nicholas Hodges ISO Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay

Declaration - Other (of Nicholas Hodges) filed by The Chamberlain Group Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by The Chamberlain Group Inc.

173 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Discovery Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Discovery Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Informal Discovery Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) set for 9/11/2020 at 11:00 a.m. vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) set for 9/11/2020 at 11:00 a.m. vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference (Civil) scheduled for 08/26/2020 at 09:30AM before Judge Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/11/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Answer (Second Amended Answer) filed by The Chamberlain Group Inc. Filed By: The Chamberlain Group Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by The Chamberlain Group Inc. Refers to: Linares, Timothy; Sidney Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares; Timothy Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares; Linares, Sidney Filed By: The Chamberlain Group Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
200 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Linares, Sidney; Sidney Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares; Linares, Timothy; Timothy Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares. Refers to: Worthington, William; The Chamberlain Group Inc; Reser, Ralph; Reser, Eric; Gate Masters Inc; Flood, Timothy; Flood, Norma Filed By: Linares, Sidney (Plaintiff); Sidney Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares (Plaintiff); Linares, Timothy (Plaintiff); Timothy Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/19/2020 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Linares, Timothy; Linares, Sidney; Sidney Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares; Timothy Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares. Refers to: Worthington, William; The Chamberlain Group Inc; Reser, Ralph; Reser, Eric; Gate Masters Inc; Flood, Timothy; Flood, Norma Filed By: Linares, Timothy (Plaintiff); Linares, Sidney (Plaintiff); Sidney Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares (Plaintiff); Timothy Linares as Successor In Interest to Tracy Linares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Linares, Timothy; Worthington, William. Refers to: The Chamberlain Group Inc; Reser, Ralph; Reser, Eric; Gate Masters Inc; Flood, Timothy; Flood, Norma Filed By: Linares, Timothy (Plaintiff); Worthington, William (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Linares, Timothy; Worthington, William. Refers to: Worthington, William Filed By: Linares, Sidney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Linares, Timothy; Worthington, William. Refers to: The Chamberlain Group Inc; Reser, Ralph; Reser, Eric; Gate Masters Inc; Flood, Timothy; Flood, Norma Filed By: Linares, Timothy (Plaintiff); Worthington, William (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Linares, Timothy; Worthington, William. Refers to: The Chamberlain Group Inc; Reser, Ralph; Reser, Eric; Gate Masters Inc; Flood, Timothy; Flood, Norma Filed By: Linares, Timothy (Plaintiff); Worthington, William (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE CHAMBERLAIN GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neal, Todd