This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/03/2020 at 02:14:19 (UTC).

Limited Conservatorship of Catherine Jocelle D. Guerra

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Limited Conservatorship of Catherine Jocelle D Guerra was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Longstreth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robert Longstreth

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Conservators

Guerra, Marcelino Sales

Guerra, Jocelyn Diaz

Conservatee

Guerra, Catherine Jocelle D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservatee Attorney

VANDERVEEN, JEFFREY T

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2020
  • HearingLocation: 502; Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Limited Conservator - Petition for Appointment of Probate Limited Conservator of Person Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketThe Petition for Appointment of Limited Conservator was rescheduled to 06/18/2020 at 01:45:00 PM in 502 before Robert Longstreth at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Limited Conservator scheduled for 06/18/2020 at 01:45:00 PM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship filed by Guerra, Marcelino Sales. Filed By: Guerra, Marcelino Sales (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCitation for Conservatorship and Proof of Service filed by Guerra, Marcelino Sales. Filed By: Guerra, Marcelino Sales (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Probate Limited Conservator of Person Only filed by Guerra, Marcelino Sales; Guerra, Jocelyn Diaz. Refers to: Guerra, Catherine; Guerra, Jocelyn; Guerra, Marcelino Filed By: Guerra, Marcelino Sales (Petitioner); Guerra, Jocelyn Diaz (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketConfidential Conservator Screening Form filed by Guerra, Marcelino Sales; Guerra, Jocelyn Diaz. Refers to: Guerra, Catherine Filed By: Guerra, Marcelino Sales (Petitioner); Guerra, Jocelyn Diaz (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCitation - Conservatorship filed by Guerra, Marcelino Sales; Guerra, Jocelyn Diaz. Refers to: Guerra, Catherine Filed By: Guerra, Marcelino Sales (Petitioner); Guerra, Jocelyn Diaz (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDuties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook filed by Guerra, Marcelino Sales; Guerra, Jocelyn Diaz. Refers to: Guerra, Catherine Filed By: Guerra, Marcelino Sales (Petitioner); Guerra, Jocelyn Diaz (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketReferral Information and List of Relatives (Confidential) filed by Guerra, Marcelino Sales; Guerra, Jocelyn Diaz. Refers to: Guerra, Catherine Filed By: Guerra, Marcelino Sales (Petitioner); Guerra, Jocelyn Diaz (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information filed by Guerra, Marcelino Sales; Guerra, Jocelyn Diaz. Refers to: Guerra, Catherine Filed By: Guerra, Marcelino Sales (Petitioner); Guerra, Jocelyn Diaz (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketConfidential Conservator Screening Form (Jocelyn Diaz Guerra) filed by Guerra, Marcelino Sales; Guerra, Jocelyn Diaz. Filed By: Guerra, Marcelino Sales (Petitioner); Guerra, Jocelyn Diaz (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketWaiver of Notice (Waiver of Notice and Consent to Act) filed by Guerra, Marcelino Sales; Guerra, Jocelyn Diaz. Filed By: Guerra, Marcelino Sales (Petitioner); Guerra, Jocelyn Diaz (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCapacity Declaration - Conservatorship filed by Guerra, Marcelino Sales; Guerra, Jocelyn Diaz. Filed By: Guerra, Marcelino Sales (Petitioner); Guerra, Jocelyn Diaz (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Longstreth, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Limited Conservator scheduled for 04/16/2020 at 01:45:00 PM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Guerra, Catherine Jocelle D.; Guerra, Catherine Jocelle D.. Filed By: Guerra, Marcelino Sales (Petitioner); Guerra, Catherine Jocelle D. (Proposed Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Guerra, Catherine Jocelle D.; Guerra, Catherine Jocelle D.. Filed By: Guerra, Marcelino Sales (Petitioner); Guerra, Catherine Jocelle D. (Proposed Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Court Reporter By Party with a Fee Waiver filed by Guerra, Marcelino Sales. Filed By: Guerra, Marcelino Sales (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.