Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/29/2021 at 07:42:22 (UTC).

Liesch vs Ralphs Grocery Company

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 Liesch filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ralphs Grocery Company. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************P-NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Liesch, Ronald

Defendant

Ralphs Grocery Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fuhrman, William R

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM R FUHRMAN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Liesch, Ronald.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Liesch, Ronald. Refers to: Ralphs Grocery Company

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Liesch, Ronald. Refers to: Ralphs Grocery Company

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Liesch, Ronald. Refers to: Ralphs Grocery Company

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-28; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Liesch, Ronald. Filed By: Liesch, Ronald (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/17/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Liesch, Ronald. Refers to: Ralphs Grocery Company Filed By: Liesch, Ronald (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Liesch, Ronald. Refers to: Ralphs Grocery Company Filed By: Liesch, Ronald (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Liesch, Ronald. Refers to: Ralphs Grocery Company Filed By: Liesch, Ronald (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fuhrman, William R.