This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/09/2023 at 03:44:19 (UTC).

Licea vs Zoological Society of San Diego

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 Licea filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Zoological Society of San Diego. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Licea, Luis

Defendant

Zoological Society of San Diego

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ferrell, Scott J

4100 Newport Place Drive Ste 800

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorney

Roller, Amber L.

Attorney at OGLEETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART PC

400 S Hope Street 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Licea, Luis. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Licea, Luis. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Licea, Luis. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Zoological Society of San Diego.

Notice of Unconditional Settlement (Notices)

Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Licea, Luis. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Licea, Luis.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Licea, Luis .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Zoological Society of San Diego.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Licea, Luis.; Filed By: Licea, Luis (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/17/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Licea, Luis. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego; Filed By: Licea, Luis (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Zoological Society of San Diego.; Filed By: Zoological Society of San Diego (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/17/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Licea, Luis. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego; Filed By: Licea, Luis (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Licea, Luis. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego; Filed By: Licea, Luis (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Licea, Luis. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego; Filed By: Licea, Luis (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Zoological Society of San Diego; DBA : The San Diego Zoo is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amber L Roller