This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/17/2018 at 17:08:42 (UTC).

Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company vs Dines

Case Summary

On 08/31/2017 Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Dines. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE BACAL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE BACAL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Respondent

DINES, JERI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

PASTERNACK, BARRY A

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF BARRY PASTERNACK

1230 Columbia Street Ste 930

San Diego, CA 92101

ZYMAN, STELLA H

P O Box 85462

San Diego, CA 92186

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 02/02/2018 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dines, Jeri. Refers to: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company

Petition - Other

Petition - Other filed by Dines, Jeri. Refers to: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company

Request for Dismissal of Complaint

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketOSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 02/02/2018 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketPetition - Other dismissed without prejudice as to Dines, Jeri .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketPetition - Other dismissed without prejudice as to Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Filed By: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 02/02/2018 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dines, Jeri. Refers to: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company Filed By: Dines, Jeri (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Other filed by Dines, Jeri. Refers to: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company Filed By: Dines, Jeri (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PASTERNACK BARRY ARTHUR

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZYMAN STELLA H. ESQ.