This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/08/2018 at 22:23:43 (UTC).

Lexter Torres vs Centex Homes Inc

Case Summary

On 11/20/2014 Lexter Torres filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Centex Homes Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD L. STYN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD L. STYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Horan, Laura

Horan, Sean

Huber, Floyd

Kleefstra, Aline

Kleefstra, Wouter

Defendants

CENTEX HOMES OF CALIFORNIA LLC

Centex Homes Inc

Centex Real Estate Corporation

Pulte Home Corporation

Pultegroup Inc

Centex Homes

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PRO-SCAPE, INC.

J&B MANUFACTURING CORP.; DBA : SAN DIEGO MIRROR AND WINDOW

NEW VISION DRYWALL, INC.; DBA : PERFORMANCE PLUS DRYWALL

CONCRETE CONCEPTS, INC.

MJB HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING, INC.

TRUTEAM OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; FKA : SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS, INC.

HOMESTEAD SHEET METAL

AMERICAN COATINGS, INC.; DBA : SOUTH COAST WATERPROOFING

DAVIS STONE, INCORPORATED; AKA : KENNETH DAVIS

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Naumann, William H; Ornelas, Parada K

Attorney at THE NAUMANN LAW FIRM

10731 Treena Street 101

San Diego, CA 92131

ORNELAS, PARADA K

Attorney at WILLSON TURNER KOSMO LLP

550 W C Street 1050

San Diego, CA 92101

NAUMANN, WILLIAM H

Attorney at THE NAUMANN LAW FIRM PC

10200 Willow Creek Road 150

San Diego, CA 92131

Defendant Attorneys

SCHAEFFER, SANDRA

2929 E Camelback Rd

Phoenix, AZ 85016

THORSON, ERIC W

Attorney at LEE HERNANDEZ LANDRUM & GAROFALO

Journey

Aliso Viejo, CA 92656

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CARVALHO, JEFFREY P

Attorney at RYAN CARVALHO LLP

8989 Rio San Diego Drive 368

San Diego, CA 92108

EBNER, DARREN M

18100 Von Karman Ave Suite 750

Irvine, CA 92612

JEFFERY, MONA J

Attorney at JEFFERY & GROSFELD LLP

725 Town & Country Road 450

Orange, CA 92868

Other Attorneys

CZELUSNIAK, DAVID E

1 Macarthur 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

MENDES, PATRICK

PARK, DAVID S

MOORE, DONNA

9325 Sky Park Ct Ste 230

San Diego, CA 92123

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (ENTERED as to Premier Design Painting Inc) filed by Centex Homes; Centex Real Estate Corporation. Refers to: Premier Design Painting, Inc.

Cross-Defendant Pro-Scape, Inc.'s Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Pro-Scape, Inc..

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/24/2015 10:00:00 AM.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Centex Homes; Centex Real Estate Corporation.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 10/30/2015 at 10:30:00 AM in C-62 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Torres, Lexter; Torres, Dena Marie; Vi, Marilyn; Kleefstra, Wouter; Kleefstra, Aline; Huber, Floyd; Horan, Sean; Horan, Laura. Refers to: Centex Homes Inc; Centex Real Estate Corporation; CENTEX HOMES OF CALIFORNIA LLC; Pulte Home Corporation; Pultegroup Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Blaylock, Alexis; Johnson, Timothy; Johnson, Katherine; Vuong, Kalynn; Torres, Lexter; Torres, Dena Marie; Vi, Marilyn; Kleefstra, Wouter; Kleefstra, Aline; Williams, Cara;OTHERS.

Answer

Answer filed by Petersen-Dean, Inc..

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Centex Homes; Centex Real Estate Corporation.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Cause of Actions

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Centex Homes; Centex Real Estate Corporation.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Torres, Lexter; Torres, Dena Marie; Vi, Marilyn; Kleefstra, Wouter; Kleefstra, Aline; Huber, Floyd; Horan, Sean; Horan, Laura. Refers to: Centex Homes Inc; Centex Real Estate Corporation; CENTEX HOMES OF CALIFORNIA LLC; Pulte Home Corporation; Pultegroup Inc

Stipulation - Other

Stipulation - Other (and Order to File Second Amended Complaint and Stay Litigation Pending Compliance with SB800 Prelitigation Procedures) filed by Centex Homes; Centex Real Estate Corporation; Johnson, Timothy; Horan, Sean; Torres, Lexter; Torres, Dena Marie; Vi, Marilyn; Kleefstra, Wouter; Kleefstra, Aline; Huber, Floyd;OTHERS.

Request and Order to Dismiss Class Allegations

Order - Other (Request and Order to Dismiss Class Allegations) filed by Torres, Lexter.

Notice of Stay of Proceedings

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Participant) filed by PHILIPS PRODUCTS INC; PHILIPS PRODUCTS INC.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Torres, Lexter; Torres, Dena Marie; Vi, Marilyn; Kleefstra, Wouter; Kleefstra, Aline; Vuong, Kalynn; Blaylock, Alexis. Refers to: Centex Real Estate Corporation

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Horan, Sean; Torres, Lexter; Torres, Dena Marie; Kleefstra, Wouter; Kleefstra, Aline; Huber, Floyd; Horan, Laura; Williams, Sean; Williams, Cara; Tanacio, Marcosa;OTHERS.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 10/28/2016 at 10:30:00 AM in C-62 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Torres, Lexter; Torres, Dena Marie; Vi, Marilyn; Kleefstra, Wouter; Kleefstra, Aline; Vuong, Kalynn; Blaylock, Alexis. Refers to: Centex Homes

121 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Centex Homes; Centex Real Estate Corporation. Refers to: American Coatings, Inc.; Aquatic Co.; CCM Enterprises; Davis Stone Inc; Fenceworks, Inc.; Heritage Landscape, Inc.; Homestead Sheet Metal; Hy-Lang Electric California, Inc.; MJB Heating & Air Conditioning, Inc.; New Vision Drywall, Inc.; Pacific Production Plumbing; Petersen-Dean, Inc.; Pro-Scape, Inc.; R.W. Colgate, Incorporated; Sunset West Framing, Inc.; Surecraft Supply, Inc.; Truman Door Systems, Inc.; Truteam of California, Inc. Filed By: Centex Homes (Defendant); Centex Real Estate Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 05/12/2017 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • OSC - Non-Sanction scheduled for 05/12/2017 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Pacific Production Plumbing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to J&B Manufacturing Corp..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to JPS Surface Solutions, Inc..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Hy-Lang Electric California, Inc..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Homestead Sheet Metal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Heritage Landscape, Inc..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Fenceworks, Inc..

    Read MoreRead Less
196 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Horan, Sean; Torres, Lexter; Torres, Dena Marie; Vi, Marilyn; Kleefstra, Wouter; Kleefstra, Aline; Huber, Floyd; Horan, Laura. Filed By: Horan, Sean (Plaintiff); Torres, Lexter (Plaintiff); Torres, Dena Marie (Plaintiff); Vi, Marilyn (Plaintiff); Kleefstra, Wouter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Horan, Sean; Torres, Lexter; Torres, Dena Marie; Vi, Marilyn; Kleefstra, Wouter; Kleefstra, Aline; Huber, Floyd; Horan, Laura. Filed By: Horan, Sean (Plaintiff); Torres, Lexter (Plaintiff); Torres, Dena Marie (Plaintiff); Vi, Marilyn (Plaintiff); Kleefstra, Wouter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Horan, Sean; Torres, Lexter; Torres, Dena Marie; Vi, Marilyn; Kleefstra, Wouter; Kleefstra, Aline; Huber, Floyd; Horan, Laura. Filed By: Horan, Sean (Plaintiff); Torres, Lexter (Plaintiff); Torres, Dena Marie (Plaintiff); Vi, Marilyn (Plaintiff); Kleefstra, Wouter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/24/2015 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Torres, Lexter; Torres, Dena Marie; Vi, Marilyn; Kleefstra, Wouter; Kleefstra, Aline; Huber, Floyd; Horan, Sean; Horan, Laura. Refers to: Centex Homes Inc; Centex Real Estate Corporation; CENTEX HOMES OF CALIFORNIA LLC; Pulte Home Corporation; Pultegroup Inc Filed By: Torres, Lexter (Plaintiff); Torres, Dena Marie (Plaintiff); Vi, Marilyn (Plaintiff); Kleefstra, Wouter (Plaintiff); Kleefstra, Aline (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Torres, Lexter; Torres, Dena Marie; Vi, Marilyn; Kleefstra, Wouter; Kleefstra, Aline; Huber, Floyd; Horan, Sean; Horan, Laura. Refers to: Centex Homes Inc; Centex Real Estate Corporation; CENTEX HOMES OF CALIFORNIA LLC; Pulte Home Corporation; Pultegroup Inc Filed By: Torres, Lexter (Plaintiff); Torres, Dena Marie (Plaintiff); Vi, Marilyn (Plaintiff); Kleefstra, Wouter (Plaintiff); Kleefstra, Aline (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Torres, Lexter; Torres, Dena Marie; Vi, Marilyn; Kleefstra, Wouter; Kleefstra, Aline; Huber, Floyd; Horan, Sean; Horan, Laura. Refers to: Centex Homes Inc; Centex Real Estate Corporation; CENTEX HOMES OF CALIFORNIA LLC; Pulte Home Corporation; Pultegroup Inc Filed By: Torres, Lexter (Plaintiff); Torres, Dena Marie (Plaintiff); Vi, Marilyn (Plaintiff); Kleefstra, Wouter (Plaintiff); Kleefstra, Aline (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.