This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/01/2022 at 07:10:17 (UTC).

LEVINE vs THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC

Case Summary

On 09/02/2022 LEVINE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LeVine, Mark

LeVine, Yangping

Defendant

THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pasternack, Barry A

1230 Columbia Street 930

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Lewis, J Paul

501 W Broadway Unit 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by LeVine, Mark; LeVine, Yangping. Refers to: THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by LeVine, Mark; LeVine, Yangping.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by LeVine, Mark; LeVine, Yangping.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Requests)

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Arbitrate and Order Signed on 10/12/22) filed by THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC; LeVine, Mark; LeVine, Yangping.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Arbitrate and Order Signed on 10/12/22) filed by THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC; LeVine, Mark; LeVine, Yangping.; Filed By: THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC (Defendant); LeVine, Mark (Plaintiff); LeVine, Yangping (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by LeVine, Mark; LeVine, Yangping.; Filed By: LeVine, Mark (Plaintiff); LeVine, Yangping (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by LeVine, Mark; LeVine, Yangping.; Filed By: LeVine, Mark (Plaintiff); LeVine, Yangping (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by LeVine, Mark; LeVine, Yangping. Refers to: THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC; Filed By: LeVine, Mark (Plaintiff); LeVine, Yangping (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Irvine Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lewis, J Paul