This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/02/2023 at 01:31:55 (UTC).

Lena Jajjo vs. Leticia A Honkin

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 Lena Jajjo filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Leticia A Honkin. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-EC

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jajjo, Lena

El Cajon, CA 92019

Respondent

Honkin, Leticia A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 12/20/2022 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketRestraining order as requested denied with prejudice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (by Mail Re: D-235 and USB video) filed by Honkin, Leticia A. Refers to: Jajjo, Lena; Filed By: Honkin, Leticia A (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Lodgment filed by Honkin, Leticia A. Refers to: Jajjo, Lena; Filed By: Honkin, Leticia A (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Jajjo, Lena.; Filed By: Jajjo, Lena (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Lodgment filed by Jajjo, Lena.; Filed By: Jajjo, Lena (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Jajjo, Lena. Refers to: Honkin, Leticia; Jajjo, Faris; Jajjo, Simon; Jajjo, Natalia; Filed By: Jajjo, Lena (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 12/20/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at East County in E-21 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Jajjo, Lena. Refers to: Honkin, Leticia; Filed By: Jajjo, Lena (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Jajjo, Lena. Refers to: Honkin, Leticia; Filed By: Jajjo, Lena (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department E-21.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jajjo, Lena. Refers to: Honkin, Leticia; Jajjo, Faris; Jajjo, Simon; Jajjo, Natalia; Filed By: Jajjo, Lena (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Jajjo, Lena. Refers to: Honkin, Leticia; Jajjo, Faris; Jajjo, Simon; Jajjo, Natalia; Filed By: Jajjo, Lena (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less