This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/25/2022 at 06:24:02 (UTC).

Leila Martinez vs. All American Design, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2017 Leila Martinez filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against All American Design, Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cynthia A. Freeland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cynthia A. Freeland

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARTINEZ SR, JOE F.

MARTINEZ, LEILA

Defendants

SHAUL, ADAM ; AKA : SHAUL, AVRAHAM A.

ALL AMERICAN DESIGN, INC.

GREEN LIVING INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ADES, SHAI

Sananes, Oren

GREEN LIVING CA

FOLEY, RANDON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THORNTON, AUDREY P

Attorney at THORNTON KOLLER

2100 Palomar Airport Rd Ste 205

Carlsbad, CA 92011

Defendant Attorneys

MOUZIS, GERALD W

Attorney at THE MOUZIS LAW FIRM APC

17671 Irvine Boulevard Suite 207

Tustin, CA 92780

AUSTIN, GINA M

3990 Old Town Avenue A 112

San Diego, CA 92110

Rozmus, Tamara Leetham

3990 Old Town Avenue A 112

San Diego, CA 92110

 

Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party SD

Abstract of Judgment submitted by Martinez, Leila; Martinez, Joe F. Sr rejected on 07/26/2019. Refers to: Sananes, Oren; All American Design, Inc.

Abstract of Judgment issued.

Abstract of Judgment issued.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Opposition - Other

Opposition - Other (05/11/2018) filed by Martinez, Joe F. Sr; Martinez, Leila.

Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer

Opposition - Other (05/11/2018) filed by Martinez, Joe F. Sr; Martinez, Leila.

Reply to Opposition to Demurrer

Reply to Opposition - Other (5/11/18) filed by Shaul, Adam; Ades Construction; Green Living Inc., a California Corporation; Foley, Randon; Ades, Shai.

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (5/11/18) filed by Shaul, Adam; Ades Construction; Green Living Inc., a California Corporation; Foley, Randon; Ades, Shai.

Declaration of Gerald W. Mouzis in Support of Reply to Opposition to Demurrer and Motion to Strike

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (5/11/18) filed by Shaul, Adam; Ades Construction; Green Living Inc., a California Corporation; Foley, Randon; Ades, Shai.

Notice of Death of Plaintiff

Notice of Death filed by Martinez, Leila.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (5/23) filed by Martinez, Leila.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/23/2018 08:30:00 AM.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Martinez, Leila. Refers to: Green Living Inc., a California Corporation

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 06/01/2018 01:30:00 PM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 06/01/2018 01:30:00 PM.

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (6/15 MTN FOR CALENDAR PREFERENCE) filed by Shaul, Adam; Foley, Randon; Green Living Inc., a California Corporation; Ades Construction.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (**1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT**) filed by Martinez, Joe F. Sr; Martinez, Leila. Refers to: Shaul, Adam; Ades, Shai; All American Design, Inc.; Green Living Inc., a California Corporation; GREEN LIVING CA; FOLEY, RANDON; Sananes, Oren

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 06/15/2018 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 08/31/2018 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

130 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned from Stern,Jacqueline to Freeland,Cynthia effective 11/07/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment submitted by Martinez, Leila; Martinez, Joe F. Sr rejected on 07/26/2019. Refers to: Sananes, Oren; All American Design, Inc.; Filed By: Martinez, Leila (Plaintiff); Martinez, Joe F. Sr (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
182 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Martinez, Leila.; Filed By: Martinez, Leila (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/05/2018 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Stern, Jacqueline.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Martinez, Leila; Martinez, Joe F. Sr.; Filed By: Martinez, Leila (Plaintiff); Martinez, Joe F. Sr (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Martinez, Leila; Martinez, Joe F. Sr. Refers to: All American Design, Inc.; Shaul, Adam; Anderson, John; Foley, Randon; Filed By: Martinez, Leila (Plaintiff); Martinez, Joe F. Sr (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Martinez, Leila; Martinez, Joe F. Sr. Refers to: All American Design, Inc.; Shaul, Adam; Anderson, John; Foley, Randon; Filed By: Martinez, Leila (Plaintiff); Martinez, Joe F. Sr (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Martinez, Leila; Martinez, Joe F. Sr. Refers to: All American Design, Inc.; Shaul, Adam; Anderson, John; Foley, Randon; Filed By: Martinez, Leila (Plaintiff); Martinez, Joe F. Sr (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Martinez, Leila; Martinez, Joe F. Sr. Refers to: All American Design, Inc.; Shaul, Adam; Anderson, John; Foley, Randon; Green Living Inc., a California Corporation; Ades, Shai; Ades Construction; Filed By: Martinez, Leila (Plaintiff); Martinez, Joe F. Sr (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL AMERICAN DESIGN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GREEN LIVING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rozmus, Tamara Leetham

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gina M Austin