This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 12:00:30 (UTC).

Leggitt vs Southwest Pipeline and Trenchless Corp

Case Summary

On 06/28/2018 Leggitt filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Southwest Pipeline and Trenchless Corp. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEGGITT, RHONDA

Defendants

SOUTHWEST PIPELINE AND TRENCHLESS CORP

COLE, JOHN RICHARD

Cole, John

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALLENSTEIN, ROBERT L

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT WALLENSTEIN

550 West C Street 1690

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Farmer, John T

402 W Broadway Suite 1100

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer filed by Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp; Cole, John.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp) filed by Leggitt, Rhonda. Refers to: Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (John Richard Cole) filed by Leggitt, Rhonda. Refers to: Cole, John

Complaint

Complaint filed by Leggitt, Rhonda. Refers to: Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp; Cole, John

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Leggitt, Rhonda. Refers to: Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp; Cole, John

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Leggitt, Rhonda. Refers to: Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp; Cole, John

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Leggitt, Rhonda.

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2018
  • Cases consolidated on 11/09/2018. 37-2017-00047990-CU-PA-CTL is designated the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/14/2018 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp; Cole, John. Filed By: Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp (Defendant); Cole, John (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (John Richard Cole) filed by Leggitt, Rhonda. Refers to: Cole, John Filed By: Leggitt, Rhonda (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp) filed by Leggitt, Rhonda. Refers to: Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp Filed By: Leggitt, Rhonda (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Related Case filed by Leggitt, Rhonda. Filed By: Leggitt, Rhonda (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/14/2018 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Summons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Leggitt, Rhonda. Refers to: Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp; Cole, John Filed By: Leggitt, Rhonda (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Leggitt, Rhonda. Refers to: Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp; Cole, John Filed By: Leggitt, Rhonda (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Leggitt, Rhonda. Refers to: Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp; Cole, John; Cole, John Filed By: Leggitt, Rhonda (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less