Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/17/2021 at 09:10:13 (UTC).

Leggett vs Guerard

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 Leggett filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Guerard. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Leggett, Jamie Lynn

Respondents

Coffield, Alex

Guerard, Diana

Sheilds, Rodney

Rheinhold, Jerry

Doe, April

Davis, Jessica

Wright, Marciana

Makram, Abdul

Davis, Eric

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketAffidavit - Other (Affidavid of Unsuccessful Service) filed by Leggett, Jamie Lynn. Refers to: Doe, April Filed By: Leggett, Jamie Lynn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketAffidavit - Other (Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service) filed by Leggett, Jamie Lynn. Refers to: Makram, Abdul Filed By: Leggett, Jamie Lynn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 03/12/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketResponse to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Guerard, Diana. Filed By: Guerard, Diana (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketAffidavit - Other (Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service) filed by Leggett, Jamie Lynn. Refers to: Rheinhold, Jerry Filed By: Leggett, Jamie Lynn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Leggett, Jamie Lynn. Filed By: Leggett, Jamie Lynn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Leggett, Jamie Lynn. Filed By: Leggett, Jamie Lynn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Leggett, Jamie Lynn. Filed By: Leggett, Jamie Lynn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Leggett, Jamie Lynn. Refers to: Davis, Eric Filed By: Leggett, Jamie Lynn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Leggett, Jamie Lynn. Refers to: Davis, Jessica Filed By: Leggett, Jamie Lynn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Leggett, Jamie Lynn. Refers to: Guerard, Diana Filed By: Leggett, Jamie Lynn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Leggett, Jamie Lynn. Refers to: Guerard, Diana; Makram, Abdul; Wright, Marciana; Davis, Jessica; Davis, Eric; Coffield, Alex; Rheinhold, Jerry; Sheilds, Rodney; Doe, April Filed By: Leggett, Jamie Lynn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Leggett, Jamie Lynn. Refers to: Guerard, Diana; Makram, Abdul; Wright, Marciana; Davis, Jessica; Davis, Eric; Coffield, Alex; Rheinhold, Jerry; Sheilds, Rodney; Doe, April Filed By: Leggett, Jamie Lynn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 03/12/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Leggett, Jamie Lynn. Filed By: Leggett, Jamie Lynn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Leggett, Jamie Lynn. Filed By: Leggett, Jamie Lynn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less