This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/11/2018 at 15:11:53 (UTC).

Lee vs. Moutafisi

Case Summary

On 04/24/2009 Lee filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Moutafisi. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHUNG, YOON S

San Diego, CA 92111

LEE, SEOYOUNG

San Diego, CA 92111

LEE, YONGJAE

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendants

MOUTAFISI, MAGDALINI ; AKA : MOUDAFSI, MAGDALINI

INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB; AKA : AAA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2009
  • Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 07/02/2009 at 02:30:00 PM at Central in KM-2 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2009
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Chung, Yoon S; Lee, Seoyoung; Lee, Yongjae. Refers to: Moutafisi, Magdalini; Inter Insurance Exchange of the Automobile Club Filed By: Chung, Yoon S (Plaintiff); Lee, Seoyoung (Plaintiff); Lee, Yongjae (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Lee, Yongjae. Refers to: Lee, Kap Filed By: Lee, Yongjae (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (Kap J Lee) filed by Lee, Seoyoung. Filed By: Lee, Seoyoung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2009
  • Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 07/02/2009 at 02:30:00 PM at Central in KM-2 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2009
  • Case assigned to Department KM-2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • Application for Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Lee, Yongjae; Lee, Seoyoung; Chung, Yoon S. Refers to: Moutafisi, Magdalini; Inter Insurance Exchange of the Automobile Club Filed By: Lee, Yongjae (Plaintiff); Lee, Seoyoung (Plaintiff); Chung, Yoon S (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Lee, Yongjae; Lee, Seoyoung; Chung, Yoon S. Refers to: Moutafisi, Magdalini; Inter Insurance Exchange of the Automobile Club Filed By: Lee, Yongjae (Plaintiff); Lee, Seoyoung (Plaintiff); Chung, Yoon S (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB is a litigant