This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/03/2021 at 03:00:54 (UTC).

LEE vs. IMPERIAL MANDARIN RESTAURANT INC

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 LEE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IMPERIAL MANDARIN RESTAURANT INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEE, ARLENE LAO

Defendant

IMPERIAL MANDARIN RESTAURANT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARDIROSSIAN, GARO

Mardirossian Law Building, 6311 Wilshire Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Defendant Attorney

Clements, Thomas V

Attorney at CLEMENTS AND KNOCKS LLP

7825 Fay Avenue 200

La Jolla, CA 92037

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by LEE, ARLENE LAO. Refers to: IMPERIAL MANDARIN RESTAURANT INC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by LEE, ARLENE LAO. Refers to: IMPERIAL MANDARIN RESTAURANT INC

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Complaint filed by LEE, ARLENE LAO. Refers to: IMPERIAL MANDARIN RESTAURANT INC

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by LEE, ARLENE LAO. Refers to: IMPERIAL MANDARIN RESTAURANT INC

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/15/2021 09:30:00 AM.

Notice of Payment of Advance Jury Fee

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by LEE, ARLENE LAO.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by LEE, ARLENE LAO.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by IMPERIAL MANDARIN RESTAURANT INC.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by IMPERIAL MANDARIN RESTAURANT INC.

Answer

Answer (to complaint) filed by Imperial Mandarin Restaurant Inc.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 09/09/2022 at 09:00AM before Judge John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 08/26/2022 at 08:30AM before Judge John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/15/2021 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by LEE, ARLENE LAO. Filed By: LEE, ARLENE LAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by LEE, ARLENE LAO. Filed By: LEE, ARLENE LAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by IMPERIAL MANDARIN RESTAURANT INC. Filed By: IMPERIAL MANDARIN RESTAURANT INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by IMPERIAL MANDARIN RESTAURANT INC. Filed By: IMPERIAL MANDARIN RESTAURANT INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (to complaint) filed by Imperial Mandarin Restaurant Inc. Filed By: Imperial Mandarin Restaurant Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by LEE, ARLENE LAO. Refers to: IMPERIAL MANDARIN RESTAURANT INC Filed By: LEE, ARLENE LAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/15/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by LEE, ARLENE LAO. Refers to: IMPERIAL MANDARIN RESTAURANT INC Filed By: LEE, ARLENE LAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by LEE, ARLENE LAO. Refers to: IMPERIAL MANDARIN RESTAURANT INC Filed By: LEE, ARLENE LAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by LEE, ARLENE LAO. Refers to: IMPERIAL MANDARIN RESTAURANT INC Filed By: LEE, ARLENE LAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLEMENTS THOMAS V. ESQ.