This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/12/2018 at 04:22:59 (UTC).

LEDFORD vs WYLE LABORATORIES INC

Case Summary

On 06/22/2015 LEDFORD filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WYLE LABORATORIES INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOAN M. LEWIS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOAN M. LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ledford, Lawrence D

Defendant

Wyle Laboratories Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Whooper, Jason A

Attorney at JASON WHOOPER ATTORNEY AT LAW

6363 Greeenwich Drive Suite 140

San Diego, CA 92122

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Ledford, Lawrence D.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Ledford, Lawrence D.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ledford, Lawrence D.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Ledford, Lawrence D.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

and Order to Extend defendants deadline to respond

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (and Order to Extend defendants deadline to respond) filed by Wyle Laboratories Inc; Ledford, Lawrence D.

Stipulation - Other

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (and Order to Stay Proceedings) filed by Wyle Laboratories Inc; Ledford, Lawrence D.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Ledford, Lawrence D .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Wyle Laboratories Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Ledford, Lawrence D. Filed By: Ledford, Lawrence D (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (and Order to Stay Proceedings) filed by Wyle Laboratories Inc; Ledford, Lawrence D. Filed By: Wyle Laboratories Inc (Defendant); Ledford, Lawrence D (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/04/2015 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-65 Joan M. Lewis was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (and Order to Extend defendants deadline to respond) filed by Wyle Laboratories Inc; Ledford, Lawrence D. Filed By: Wyle Laboratories Inc (Defendant); Ledford, Lawrence D (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/04/2015 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-65 Joan M. Lewis.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Lewis, Joan.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Ledford, Lawrence D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ledford, Lawrence D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Ledford, Lawrence D.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wyle Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Whooper, Jason A