This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 04:36:00 (UTC).

Ledcor Construction Inc vs Bedley

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 Ledcor Construction Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Bedley. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ledcor Construction Inc

Respondent

Bedley, Maxwell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Marasco, Robert G

Union Bank Of California Building, 525 B St #2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service submitted by Ledcor Construction Inc rejected on 07/06/2021. Filed By: Ledcor Construction Inc (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketWorkplace Violence Restraining Order After Hearing filed by Ledcor Construction Inc. Refers to: Bedley, Maxwell Filed By: Ledcor Construction Inc (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketRestraining order as requested against MAXWELL BEDLEY was granted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 07/06/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Ledcor Construction Inc. Refers to: Bedley, Maxwell Filed By: Ledcor Construction Inc (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketApplication and Order Correcting Court Record (ROA 2) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Ledcor Construction Inc. Filed By: Ledcor Construction Inc (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketPetition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders filed by Ledcor Construction Inc. Refers to: Bjorback, Kris; Postle, Chris; Campbell, Nick; Bedley, Maxwell Filed By: Ledcor Construction Inc (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Ledcor Construction Inc. Filed By: Ledcor Construction Inc (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Ledcor Construction Inc. Refers to: Bedley, Maxwell Filed By: Ledcor Construction Inc (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 07/06/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less