This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/24/2018 at 20:57:52 (UTC).

Lazo vs. Farmers Group INC

Case Summary

On 07/20/2012 Lazo filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Farmers Group INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-EC

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lazo, Mark

Lazo, Marc

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendants

Farmers Group INC

FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lazo, Marc

Attorney at WILSON HARVEY BROWNDORF LLP

1900 Main Street 600

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant Attorney

MORENO, KENNETH H

Attorney at MURCHISON & CUMMING LLP

750 B Street 2550

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Lazo, Mark.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Lazo, Mark.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lazo, Mark.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Lazo, Marc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Lazo, Marc. Refers to: Farmers Group INC

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 02/01/2013 at 11:00:00 AM at East County in E-15 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Wohlfeil,Joel to Sturgeon,Eddie effective 11/16/2012

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (FARMERS GROUP INSURANCE) submitted by Lazo, Marc rejected on 12/03/2012. Refers to: Farmers Group INC

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default scheduled for 01/25/2013 at 11:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (DOE 1 - FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE) filed by Lazo, Marc. Refers to: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Lazo, Marc. Refers to: Farmers Group INC

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default heard 01/25/2013 11:00:00 AM.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Lazo, Marc. Refers to: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Answer

Answer filed by FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (PROTECTIVE ORDER) filed by FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE; Lazo, Marc.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Lazo, Marc.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2013
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Lazo, Marc .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Lazo, Marc. Filed By: Lazo, Marc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • Order - Other (PROTECTIVE ORDER) filed by FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. Refers to: Lazo, Marc Filed By: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (PROTECTIVE ORDER) filed by FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE; Lazo, Marc. Filed By: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Defendant); Lazo, Marc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. Filed By: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Lazo, Marc. Refers to: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE Filed By: Lazo, Marc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default heard 01/25/2013 11:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Lazo, Marc. Refers to: Farmers Group INC Filed By: Lazo, Marc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (DOE 1 - FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE) filed by Lazo, Marc. Refers to: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE Filed By: Lazo, Marc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2012
  • Due to case reassignment, any and all dates currently set in this case have been vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 02/01/2013 at 11:00:00 AM at East County in E-15 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Lazo, Marc. Refers to: Farmers Group INC Filed By: Lazo, Marc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Lazo, Marc. Filed By: Lazo, Marc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lazo, Mark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Lazo, Mark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Lazo, Mark.

    Read MoreRead Less