This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 08:29:41 (UTC).

Law vs American Honda Motor Co Inc

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 Law filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against American Honda Motor Co Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Law, Cynthia Marie

Defendants

DCH Mission Valley LLC; DBA : DCH Honda of Mission Valley

American Honda Motor Co Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wirtz, Richard M

Attorney at WIRTZ LAW APC

4370 La Jolla Village Drive 800

San Diego, CA 92122

Defendant Attorneys

Leach, Brian

2833 Laguna St

San Francisco, CA 94123

Hernandez, Monica

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOK LLP

750 B Street 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Defendant DCH Mission Valley LLC dba DCH Honda of Mission Valley's Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by DCH Mission Valley LLC.

DEFENDANT DCH MISSION VALLEY, LLC D/B/A DCH HONDA OF MISSION VALLEYS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by DCH Mission Valley LLC.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Law, Cynthia Marie.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Law, Cynthia Marie.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by American Honda Motor Co Inc.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Law, Cynthia Marie.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (of notice of jury fee deposit) filed by Law, Cynthia Marie.

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Joanne Castro, CSR#6944, (760-994-7197)) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by American Honda Motor Co Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/23/2021 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

DEFENDANT DCH MISSION VALLEY, LLC D/B/A DCH HONDA OF MISSION VALLEYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Answer filed by DCH Mission Valley LLC.

Answer by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.

Answer filed by American Honda Motor Co Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Law, Cynthia Marie. Refers to: American Honda Motor Co Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Law, Cynthia Marie. Refers to: DCH Mission Valley LLC

Complaint

Complaint filed by Law, Cynthia Marie. Refers to: American Honda Motor Co Inc; DCH Mission Valley LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Law, Cynthia Marie. Refers to: American Honda Motor Co Inc; DCH Mission Valley LLC

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Joanne Castro, CSR#6944, (760-994-7197)) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 12 months.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 04/29/2022 at 09:00AM before Judge Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 05/13/2022 at 08:45AM before Judge Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/23/2021 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by American Honda Motor Co Inc. Filed By: American Honda Motor Co Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Law, Cynthia Marie. Refers to: American Honda Motor Co Inc Filed By: Law, Cynthia Marie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Law, Cynthia Marie. Refers to: DCH Mission Valley LLC Filed By: Law, Cynthia Marie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/23/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Law, Cynthia Marie. Refers to: American Honda Motor Co Inc; DCH Mission Valley LLC Filed By: Law, Cynthia Marie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Law, Cynthia Marie. Refers to: American Honda Motor Co Inc; DCH Mission Valley LLC Filed By: Law, Cynthia Marie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Law, Cynthia Marie. Refers to: American Honda Motor Co Inc; DCH Mission Valley LLC Filed By: Law, Cynthia Marie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DCH Mission Valley LLC; DBA : DCH Honda of Mission Valley is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WIRTZ RICHARD M.