This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/01/2022 at 04:39:23 (UTC).

Lashara Johnson an Incompetent Adult By and Through Her Next Friend Beverly Smith vs. The Regents of the University of California

Case Summary

On 10/29/2018 Lashara Johnson an Incompetent Adult By and Through Her Next Friend Beverly Smith filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against The Regents of the University of California. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL R. WOHLFEIL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL R. WOHLFEIL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LASHARA JOHNSON AN INCOMPETENT ADULT BY AND THROUGH HER NEXT FRIEND BEVERLY SMITH

Gonzales, Danni

Sean Barrett a Minor by and through His Next Friend Walter T Johnson II

Johnson, Deborah

Defendants

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Dodd Sullivan NP, Rebecca

Karanjia MD, Navaz Percy

Pleshette RN, Beverly

Kim NP, Jennifer S

Olson MD, Scott E

Lam MD, Arthur M

Santiago Dieppa MD, David R

Martin MD, Joel Roger

Carroll MD, Dawn

Gomes MD, Cynthia

Steinberg MD, Jeffrey Alan

Nguyen MD, Andrew

Witt PA, Christopher

Lemkuil MD, Brian P

Minokadeh MD, Anushivran

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BOMBERGER, R MICHAEL

2869 India St

San Diego, CA 92103

Filler, Aaron G

Katiraie, Chanel

Defendant Attorney

MacRill, John R III

Attorney at DAVIS GRASS GOLDSTEIN & FINLAY

3105 Sedona Ct

Ontario, CA 91764

 

Court Documents

Motion - Other

Motion - Other (to establish admissions for all purposes) filed by The Regents of The University of California.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order (granting order establishing admissions) submitted by The Regents of The University of California received but not filed on 10/30/2020.

Motion to Compel Discovery

Amended Motion (to compel) filed by Nguyen MD, Andrew; Minokadeh MD, Anushivran; Lam MD, Arthur M; Lemkuil MD, Brian P; Witt PA, Christopher; Gomes MD, Cynthia; Santiago Dieppa MD, David R; Carroll MD, Dawn; Steinberg MD, Jeffrey Alan; Kim NP, Jennifer S;OTHERS.

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion - Other (to compel plaintiff to respond to form interrogatories set one and special interrogatories set one) filed by Nguyen MD, Andrew; Minokadeh MD, Anushivran; Lam MD, Arthur M; Lemkuil MD, Brian P; Witt PA, Christopher; Santiago Dieppa MD, David R; Carroll MD, Dawn; Steinberg MD, Jeffrey Alan; Kim NP, Jennifer S; Karanjia MD, Navaz Percy;OTHERS.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 11/18/2020 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling filed by Nguyen MD, Andrew; Minokadeh MD, Anushivran; Lam MD, Arthur M; Lemkuil MD, Brian P; Witt PA, Christopher; Gomes MD, Cynthia; Santiago Dieppa MD, David R; Carroll MD, Dawn; Steinberg MD, Jeffrey Alan; Kim NP, Jennifer S;OTHERS.

Proposed Order

Order - Other filed by Nguyen MD, Andrew; Minokadeh MD, Anushivran; Lam MD, Arthur M; Lemkuil MD, Brian P; Witt PA, Christopher; Gomes MD, Cynthia; Santiago Dieppa MD, David R; Carroll MD, Dawn; Steinberg MD, Jeffrey Alan; Kim NP, Jennifer S;OTHERS.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (Notice of Non Opposition to Defendants motion to establish admission for all purposes) filed by The Regents of The University of California; Olson MD, Scott E; Lam MD, Arthur M; Martin MD, Joel Roger; Nguyen MD, Andrew; Steinberg MD, Jeffrey Alan; Santiago Dieppa MD, David R; Lemkuil MD, Brian P; Minokadeh MD, Anushivran; Dodd Sullivan NP, Rebecca;OTHERS.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Discovery Hearing heard 12/09/2020 09:00:00 AM.

Order After Hearing

Order After Hearing (Order establishing admissions) filed by The Regents of The University of California.

Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling filed by The Regents of The University of California.

Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication

Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by Nguyen MD, Andrew; Minokadeh MD, Anushivran; Lam MD, Arthur M; Lemkuil MD, Brian P; Witt PA, Christopher; Gomes MD, Cynthia; Santiago Dieppa MD, David R; Carroll MD, Dawn; Steinberg MD, Jeffrey Alan; Kim NP, Jennifer S;OTHERS.

Separate Statement in Support of MSJ

Statement of Undisputed Facts (in support of motion for summary judgment or summary adjudication) filed by Nguyen MD, Andrew; Minokadeh MD, Anushivran; Lam MD, Arthur M; Lemkuil MD, Brian P; Witt PA, Christopher; Gomes MD, Cynthia; Santiago Dieppa MD, David R; Carroll MD, Dawn; Steinberg MD, Jeffrey Alan; Kim NP, Jennifer S;OTHERS.

Exhibits in Support of MSJ

Declaration - Other (exhibits in support of motion for summary judgment or summary adjudication) filed by Nguyen MD, Andrew; Minokadeh MD, Anushivran; Lam MD, Arthur M; Lemkuil MD, Brian P; Witt PA, Christopher; Gomes MD, Cynthia; Santiago Dieppa MD, David R; Carroll MD, Dawn; Steinberg MD, Jeffrey Alan; Kim NP, Jennifer S;OTHERS.

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice (in support of motion for summary judgment or summary adjudication) filed by Nguyen MD, Andrew; Minokadeh MD, Anushivran; Lam MD, Arthur M; Lemkuil MD, Brian P; Witt PA, Christopher; Gomes MD, Cynthia; Santiago Dieppa MD, David R; Carroll MD, Dawn; Steinberg MD, Jeffrey Alan; Kim NP, Jennifer S;OTHERS.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order submitted by Nguyen MD, Andrew; Minokadeh MD, Anushivran; Lam MD, Arthur M; Lemkuil MD, Brian P; Witt PA, Christopher; Gomes MD, Cynthia; Santiago Dieppa MD, David R; Carroll MD, Dawn; Steinberg MD, Jeffrey Alan; Kim NP, Jennifer S;OTHERS received but not filed on 12/15/2020.

Proposed Judgment

Judgment (PROPOSED) submitted by Nguyen MD, Andrew; Minokadeh MD, Anushivran; Lam MD, Arthur M; Lemkuil MD, Brian P; Witt PA, Christopher; Gomes MD, Cynthia; Santiago Dieppa MD, David R; Carroll MD, Dawn; Steinberg MD, Jeffrey Alan; Kim NP, Jennifer S;OTHERS received but not filed on 12/15/2020.

Notice of Non Opposition to Motion to Compel

Notice - Other filed by Nguyen MD, Andrew; Minokadeh MD, Anushivran; Lam MD, Arthur M; Lemkuil MD, Brian P; Witt PA, Christopher; Gomes MD, Cynthia; Santiago Dieppa MD, David R; Carroll MD, Dawn; Steinberg MD, Jeffrey Alan; Kim NP, Jennifer S;OTHERS.

131 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed by Nguyen MD, Andrew; Minokadeh MD, Anushivran; Lam MD, Arthur M; Lemkuil MD, Brian P; Witt PA, Christopher; Gomes MD, Cynthia; Santiago Dieppa MD, David R; Carroll MD, Dawn; Steinberg MD, Jeffrey Alan; Kim NP, Jennifer S;OTHERS. Filed By: Nguyen MD, Andrew (Defendant); Minokadeh MD, Anushivran (Defendant); Lam MD, Arthur M (Defendant); Lemkuil MD, Brian P (Defendant); Witt PA, Christopher (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketJudgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Carroll MD, Dawn ;Dodd Sullivan NP, Rebecca ;Gomes MD, Cynthia ;Karanjia MD, Navaz Percy ;Kim NP, Jennifer S ;Lam MD, Arthur M ;Lemkuil MD, Brian P ;Martin MD, Joel Roger ;Minokadeh MD, Anushivran ;Nguyen MD, Andrew ;Olson MD, Scott E ;Pleshette RN, Beverly ;Santiago Dieppa MD, David R ;Steinberg MD, Jeffrey Alan ;The Regents of The University of California;Witt PA, Christopher and against Barrett, Sean ;Lashara Johnson an Incompetent Adult By and Through Deborah Johnson and Danni Gonzales Conservators of the Estate of LaShara Johnson for $ 0.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Amended) filed by Nguyen MD, Andrew; Minokadeh MD, Anushivran; Lam MD, Arthur M; Lemkuil MD, Brian P; Witt PA, Christopher; Gomes MD, Cynthia; Santiago Dieppa MD, David R; Carroll MD, Dawn; Steinberg MD, Jeffrey Alan; Kim NP, Jennifer S;OTHERS. Filed By: Nguyen MD, Andrew (Defendant); Minokadeh MD, Anushivran (Defendant); Lam MD, Arthur M (Defendant); Lemkuil MD, Brian P (Defendant); Witt PA, Christopher (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment filed by Nguyen MD, Andrew; Minokadeh MD, Anushivran; Lam MD, Arthur M; Lemkuil MD, Brian P; Witt PA, Christopher; Gomes MD, Cynthia; Santiago Dieppa MD, David R; Carroll MD, Dawn; Steinberg MD, Jeffrey Alan; Kim NP, Jennifer S;OTHERS. Refers to: Barrett, Sean; Lashara Johnson an Incompetent Adult By and Through Deborah Johnson and Danni Gonzales Conservators of the Estate of LaShara Johnson Filed By: Nguyen MD, Andrew (Defendant); Minokadeh MD, Anushivran (Defendant); Lam MD, Arthur M (Defendant); Lemkuil MD, Brian P (Defendant); Witt PA, Christopher (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) set for 07/09/21 at 10:45am vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial set for 07/23/21 at 8:30am vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) heard 03/12/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling filed by Nguyen MD, Andrew; Minokadeh MD, Anushivran; Lam MD, Arthur M; Lemkuil MD, Brian P; Witt PA, Christopher; Gomes MD, Cynthia; Santiago Dieppa MD, David R; Carroll MD, Dawn; Steinberg MD, Jeffrey Alan; Kim NP, Jennifer S;OTHERS. Filed By: Nguyen MD, Andrew (Defendant); Minokadeh MD, Anushivran (Defendant); Lam MD, Arthur M (Defendant); Lemkuil MD, Brian P (Defendant); Witt PA, Christopher (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) filed by Nguyen MD, Andrew; Minokadeh MD, Anushivran; Lam MD, Arthur M; Lemkuil MD, Brian P; Witt PA, Christopher; Gomes MD, Cynthia; Santiago Dieppa MD, David R; Carroll MD, Dawn; Steinberg MD, Jeffrey Alan; Kim NP, Jennifer S;OTHERS. Filed By: Nguyen MD, Andrew (Defendant); Minokadeh MD, Anushivran (Defendant); Lam MD, Arthur M (Defendant); Lemkuil MD, Brian P (Defendant); Witt PA, Christopher (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
165 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/31/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders (Second Extension) filed by Lashara Johnson an Incompetent Adult By and Through Her Next Friend Beverly Smith. Filed By: Lashara Johnson an Incompetent Adult By and Through Deborah Johnson and Danni Gonzales Conservators of the Estate of LaShara Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders (Granted; Order signed 12/21/18) filed by Lashara Johnson an Incompetent Adult By and Through Her Next Friend Beverly Smith. Filed By: Lashara Johnson an Incompetent Adult By and Through Deborah Johnson and Danni Gonzales Conservators of the Estate of LaShara Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Lashara Johnson an Incompetent Adult By and Through Her Next Friend Beverly Smith. Refers to: The Regents of The University of California Filed By: Lashara Johnson an Incompetent Adult By and Through Deborah Johnson and Danni Gonzales Conservators of the Estate of LaShara Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lashara Johnson an Incompetent Adult By and Through Her Next Friend Beverly Smith. Refers to: The Regents of The University of California Filed By: Lashara Johnson an Incompetent Adult By and Through Deborah Johnson and Danni Gonzales Conservators of the Estate of LaShara Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Lashara Johnson an Incompetent Adult By and Through Her Next Friend Beverly Smith. Refers to: The Regents of The University of California Filed By: Lashara Johnson an Incompetent Adult By and Through Deborah Johnson and Danni Gonzales Conservators of the Estate of LaShara Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/29/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACRILL JOHN R JR