This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/18/2022 at 04:00:44 (UTC).

LANLAN CHEN vs. IRVINECOMPANY (VILLAS OF RENAISSANCE)

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 LANLAN CHEN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against IRVINECOMPANY VILLAS OF RENAISSANCE. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHEN, LANLAN

San Diego, CA 92122

Defendant

IRVINECOMPANY (VILLAS OF RENAISSANCE)

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by CHEN, LANLAN. Refers to: IRVINECOMPANY (VILLAS OF RENAISSANCE)

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Request - Other

Request - Other (CERTIFIED MAIL REQUEST) filed by CHEN, LANLAN. Refers to: IRVINECOMPANY (VILLAS OF RENAISSANCE)

Returned Mail

Returned Mail filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-63; Event Type: Small Claims Court Trial - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 09/12/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-63 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCertified Mail Green Card Tracking Numbers filed by CHEN, LANLAN. Refers to: IRVINECOMPANY (VILLAS OF RENAISSANCE); Filed By: CHEN, LANLAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest - Other (CERTIFIED MAIL REQUEST) filed by CHEN, LANLAN. Refers to: IRVINECOMPANY (VILLAS OF RENAISSANCE); Filed By: CHEN, LANLAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by CHEN, LANLAN. Refers to: IRVINECOMPANY (VILLAS OF RENAISSANCE); Filed By: CHEN, LANLAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Irvine Company, LLC is a litigant