This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/26/2021 at 10:50:33 (UTC).

Languis VS Gentry JR

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 Languis filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Gentry JR. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Languis, Stephanie

Languis, Matthew

Defendants

Hickman, Danielle L

Ambrogio, Josephine C

Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage

Gentry Jr, William C

Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage Company; DBA : Coldwell Banker Realty

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NASH, ANTONY D

Defendant Attorney

Crosby, James D

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JAMES D CROSBY

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer filed by Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage Company; Ambrogio, Josephine C.

Answer

Answer filed by Hickman, Danielle L; Gentry, William C Jr.

Proof of Service of Answer

Proof of Service filed by Hickman, Danielle L; Gentry, William C Jr.

Complaint for Breach of Contract

Complaint filed by Languis, Matthew; Languis, Stephanie. Refers to: Gentry, William; Hickman, Danielle; Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage; Ambrogio, Josephine

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Languis, Matthew; Languis, Stephanie. Refers to: Gentry, William; Hickman, Danielle; Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage; Ambrogio, Josephine

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Languis, Matthew; Languis, Stephanie. Refers to: Gentry, William; Hickman, Danielle; Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage; Ambrogio, Josephine

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Hickman, Danielle L; Gentry, William C Jr. Filed By: Hickman, Danielle L (Defendant); Gentry, William C Jr (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Hickman, Danielle L; Gentry, William C Jr. Filed By: Hickman, Danielle L (Defendant); Gentry, William C Jr (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage Company; Ambrogio, Josephine C. Filed By: Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage Company (Defendant); Ambrogio, Josephine C (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Languis, Matthew; Languis, Stephanie. Refers to: Gentry, William; Hickman, Danielle; Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage; Ambrogio, Josephine; Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage Company Filed By: Languis, Matthew (Plaintiff); Languis, Stephanie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Languis, Matthew; Languis, Stephanie. Refers to: Gentry, William; Hickman, Danielle; Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage; Ambrogio, Josephine Filed By: Languis, Matthew (Plaintiff); Languis, Stephanie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Languis, Matthew; Languis, Stephanie. Refers to: Gentry, William; Hickman, Danielle; Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage; Ambrogio, Josephine Filed By: Languis, Matthew (Plaintiff); Languis, Stephanie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/14/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLDWELL BANKER MALIBU is a litigant