This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 06:09:15 (UTC).

Langley-Hansen vs Hollingsworth

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 Langley-Hansen filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Hollingsworth. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Langley-Hansen, Pamela

Defendants

HOLLINGSWORTH, JILL

Seabreeze Vacation Rentals LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Najar, Charlotte

Attorney at BATTA FULKERSON

1899 Mckee St

San Diego, CA 92110

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Langley-Hansen, Pamela. Refers to: HOLLINGSWORTH, JILL

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Langley-Hansen, Pamela. Refers to: HOLLINGSWORTH, JILL

Complaint

Complaint filed by Langley-Hansen, Pamela. Refers to: HOLLINGSWORTH, JILL

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (DOE 1) filed by Langley-Hansen, Pamela. Refers to: Seabreeze Vacation Rentals LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Langley-Hansen, Pamela. Refers to: HOLLINGSWORTH, JILL

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Langley-Hansen, Pamela. Refers to: HOLLINGSWORTH, JILL; Seabreeze Vacation Rentals LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Langley-Hansen, Pamela. Refers to: HOLLINGSWORTH, JILL; Seabreeze Vacation Rentals LLC Filed By: Langley-Hansen, Pamela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Langley-Hansen, Pamela. Refers to: HOLLINGSWORTH, JILL Filed By: Langley-Hansen, Pamela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (DOE 1) filed by Langley-Hansen, Pamela. Refers to: Seabreeze Vacation Rentals LLC Filed By: Langley-Hansen, Pamela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/18/2022 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Langley-Hansen, Pamela. Refers to: HOLLINGSWORTH, JILL; Seabreeze Vacation Rentals LLC Filed By: Langley-Hansen, Pamela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Langley-Hansen, Pamela. Refers to: HOLLINGSWORTH, JILL Filed By: Langley-Hansen, Pamela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Langley-Hansen, Pamela. Refers to: HOLLINGSWORTH, JILL Filed By: Langley-Hansen, Pamela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Caietti, Carolyn.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Seabreeze Vacation Rentals LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Najar, Charlotte