This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 04:19:34 (UTC).

LANGER VS ZOOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF SAN DIEGO

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 LANGER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ZOOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF SAN DIEGO. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald L. Styn. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald L. Styn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANGER, CHRIS

Defendant

Zoological Society of San Diego; DBA : San Diego Zoo Global

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANDY, RUSSELL C

Attorney at CENTER FOR DISABILITY ACCESS

8033 Linda Vista Road 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorney

Roller, Amber L.

400 S Hope Street 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by LANGER, CHRIS. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by LANGER, CHRIS. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego

Complaint

Complaint filed by LANGER, CHRIS. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Zoological Society of San Diego dba San Diego Zoo Global) filed by LANGER, CHRIS. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego

Notice to Adverse Party and Superior Court Clerk of Removal of Civil Action to U.S. District Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Zoological Society of San Diego.

Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case Removed to USDC

Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case filed by Zoological Society of San Diego.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/14/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings - Case filed by Zoological Society of San Diego. Filed By: Zoological Society of San Diego (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Zoological Society of San Diego. Filed By: Zoological Society of San Diego (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Zoological Society of San Diego dba San Diego Zoo Global) filed by LANGER, CHRIS. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego Filed By: LANGER, CHRIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/14/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by LANGER, CHRIS. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego Filed By: LANGER, CHRIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by LANGER, CHRIS. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego Filed By: LANGER, CHRIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by LANGER, CHRIS. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego Filed By: LANGER, CHRIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Zoological Society of San Diego; DBA : The San Diego Zoo is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANDY RUSSELL CLIVE