This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/02/2022 at 07:05:47 (UTC).

Landry vs AMERICAN IMPORTS AUTO GROUP

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 Landry filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN IMPORTS AUTO GROUP. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cynthia A. Freeland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cynthia A. Freeland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Landry, Laurie Lynne

Defendants

AMERICAN IMPORTS AUTO GROUP

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sadr, Kasra

1455 Frazee Road Mission Valley, Suite 500

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Landry, Laurie Lynne. Refers to: AMERICAN IMPORTS AUTO GROUP; UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION; HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Landry, Laurie Lynne. Refers to: AMERICAN IMPORTS AUTO GROUP; UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION; HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Landry, Laurie Lynne. Refers to: AMERICAN IMPORTS AUTO GROUP; UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION; HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Landry, Laurie Lynne.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Landry, Laurie Lynne.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Landry, Laurie Lynne.

DECLARATION OF NIMA HEYDARI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - Other (3/4/2022) filed by Landry, Laurie Lynne.

PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, PETITION FOR COURT TO PICK ARBITRATION FORUM, REQUEST FOR STAY, AND REQUEST FOR COSTS.

Motion - Other (3/4/2022) filed by Landry, Laurie Lynne.

Affidavit Re Venue

Affidavit - Other filed by Landry, Laurie Lynne.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Landry, Laurie Lynne. Filed By: Landry, Laurie Lynne (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Landry, Laurie Lynne. Filed By: Landry, Laurie Lynne (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Landry, Laurie Lynne. Filed By: Landry, Laurie Lynne (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 03/04/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - Other (3/4/2022) filed by Landry, Laurie Lynne. Filed By: Landry, Laurie Lynne (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (3/4/2022) filed by Landry, Laurie Lynne. Filed By: Landry, Laurie Lynne (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit - Other filed by Landry, Laurie Lynne. Filed By: Landry, Laurie Lynne (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/02/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Landry, Laurie Lynne. Refers to: AMERICAN IMPORTS AUTO GROUP; UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION; HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY Filed By: Landry, Laurie Lynne (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Landry, Laurie Lynne. Refers to: AMERICAN IMPORTS AUTO GROUP; UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION; HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY Filed By: Landry, Laurie Lynne (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Landry, Laurie Lynne. Refers to: AMERICAN IMPORTS AUTO GROUP; UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION; HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY Filed By: Landry, Laurie Lynne (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Freeland, Cynthia.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Auto Credit Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SADR KASRA