This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:34:28 (UTC).

La Jolla Cove Shops LLC vs. Aimco Properties LP

Case Summary

On 10/14/2014 La Jolla Cove Shops LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Aimco Properties LP. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD E. L. STRAUSS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD E. L. STRAUSS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

La Jolla Cove Shops LLC

La Jolla Exclusive LLC

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Appellants

Aimco Properties LP

Heimburge, Erik

Heimburge, Neil

SQUIRES, SAUNDRA

Baroudi, Krista

Baroudi, Marco

Squires, Saudra

Universal Boot Shops

THE REGISTRY REAL ESTATE GROUP

ANNEN, RICHARD

San Diego, CA 92106-2968

LA JOLLA COVE MOTEL AND HOTEL APARTMENTS

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

THE REGISTRY REAL ESTATE GROUP

ANNEN, RICHARD

San Diego, CA 92106-2968

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Petersen, Shannon Z

Attorney at SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP

12275 El Camino Real #200

San Diego, CA 92130

RINEY, MICHAEL H

Attorney at VANTAGE LAW GROUP A P C

Avenida De La Playa

La Jolla, CA 92037

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

HOY, VALENTINE S

Attorney at ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LL

501 West Broadway 15Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

HUTTER, TIMOTHY M

Attorney at ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LL

501 West Broadway Flr15

San Diego, CA 92101

BRENZA, LINDLEY

Attorney at BARTLIT BECK HERMAN PALENCHAR & SCOTT LLP

1801 Wewatta Street 1200

Denver, CO 80202

HEALEY, CHRISTOPHER J

4655 Executive Drive Suite 700

San Diego, CA 92121

SCHULTZ, BROOKE

SWAN, EDWARD P JR

MAZZA, PETER J.

4655 Executive Drive 1500

San Diego, CA 92121

HOWELL, EDWIN

Attorney at ATTORNEY HOWELL

12265 El Camino Real 300

San Diego, CA 92130

TANNENBAUM, ROBERT

DOMAN, JOSEPH

Attorney at BARTLIT BECK HERMAN PALENCHAR & SCOTT LLP

1801 Wewatta Street 1200

Denver, CO 80202

BECK, PHILIP

Attorney at BARTLIT BECK HERMAN PALENCHAR & SCOTT LLP

54 W Hubbard Street 300

Chicago, IL 60654

ANNEN, RICHARD JAMES

Attorney at SPARBER ANNEN MORRIS & GABRIEL

926 Tingley Ln

San Diego, CA 92106-2968

POTT, EARLL M

Attorney at KLINEDINST PC

501 W Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ANNEN, RICHARD JAMES

Attorney at SPARBER ANNEN MORRIS & GABRIEL

926 Tingley Ln

San Diego, CA 92106-2968

POTT, EARLL M

Attorney at KLINEDINST PC

501 W Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

BRENZA, LINDLEY

Attorney at BARTLIT BECK HERMAN PALENCHAR & SCOTT LLP

1801 Wewatta Street 1200

Denver, CO 80202

HEALEY, CHRISTOPHER J

4655 Executive Drive Suite 700

San Diego, CA 92121

 

Court Documents

Statement of Undisputed Facts

Statement of Undisputed Facts filed by Annen, Richard; The Registry Real Estate Group.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Annen, Richard.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by AIMCO PROPERTIES LP; Heimburge, Neil; Heimburge, Erik; Squires, Saudra.

Proof of Service re Heimburge Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

Proof of Service filed by Heimburge, Erik; Heimburge, Neil; Squires, Saundra.

to Application for Order Staying Proceedings

Reply to Opposition - Other (to Application for Order Staying Proceedings) filed by Wilson, Nathaniel S.

Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application on Remittitur

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by AIMCO PROPERTIES LP; Heimburge, Erik; La Jolla Cove Motel and Hotel Apartments; Heimburge, Neil; Squires, Saundra; Universal Boot Shops.

to Ex Parte Application for Stay of Duly Noticed Depositions

Opposition - Other (to Ex Parte Application for Stay of Duly Noticed Depositions) filed by La Jolla Cove Shops LLC.

Notice of Ruling on Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Adjudication of Fifth and Ninth Causes of Action

Notice of Ruling filed by AIMCO PROPERTIES LP.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by La Jolla Cove Shops LLC; La Jolla Exclusive LLC.

in Support of Opposition to Defendants Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings

Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Opposition to Defendants Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings) filed by La Jolla Cove Shops LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/11/2015 09:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/04/2015 09:00:00 AM.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by La Jolla Cove Shops LLC.

Aimco Properties, L.P.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint

Answer filed by AIMCO PROPERTIES LP.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by La Jolla Cove Shops LLC; La Jolla Exclusive LLC. Refers to: Aimco Properties LP; Heimburge, Neil; Heimburge, Erik; Squires, Saundra; Baroudi, Krista; Baroudi, Marco; Universal Boot Shops

Amended Notice of Hearing on Defendants' Motion re Unopposed Application for Lindley J. Brenza to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice

Notice - Other (Amended Notice of Hearing) filed by AIMCO PROPERTIES LP; La Jolla Cove Motel and Hotel Apartments; Universal Boot Shops.

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by La Jolla Cove Shops LLC.

Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff's Oppo

Notice of Lodgment (Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff's Oppo) filed by La Jolla Cove Shops LLC.

452 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Annen, Richard. Filed By: Annen, Richard (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Annen, Richard. Filed By: Annen, Richard (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Aimco Properties LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Annen, Richard .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to La Jolla Cove Shops LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to La Jolla Cove Motel and Hotel Apartments.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to The Registry Real Estate Group.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Annen, Richard .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Squires, Saundra .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Aimco Properties LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
605 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by La Jolla Cove Shops LLC; La Jolla Exclusive LLC. Filed By: La Jolla Cove Shops LLC (Plaintiff); La Jolla Exclusive LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Pendency of Action filed by La Jolla Cove Shops LLC; La Jolla Exclusive LLC. Filed By: La Jolla Cove Shops LLC (Plaintiff); La Jolla Exclusive LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Related Case filed by La Jolla Cove Shops LLC; La Jolla Exclusive LLC. Filed By: La Jolla Cove Shops LLC (Plaintiff); La Jolla Exclusive LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/20/2015 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-65 Joan M. Lewis.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Lewis, Joan.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by La Jolla Cove Shops LLC; La Jolla Exclusive LLC. Refers to: Aimco Properties LP; Heimburge, Neil; Heimburge, Erik; Squires, Saundra; Baroudi, Krista; Baroudi, Marco; Universal Boot Shops Filed By: La Jolla Cove Shops LLC (Plaintiff); La Jolla Exclusive LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by La Jolla Cove Shops LLC; La Jolla Exclusive LLC. Refers to: Aimco Properties LP; Heimburge, Neil; Heimburge, Erik; Squires, Saundra; Baroudi, Krista; Baroudi, Marco; Universal Boot Shops Filed By: La Jolla Cove Shops LLC (Plaintiff); La Jolla Exclusive LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by La Jolla Cove Shops LLC; La Jolla Exclusive LLC. Refers to: Aimco Properties LP; Heimburge, Neil; Heimburge, Erik; Squires, Saundra; Baroudi, Krista; Baroudi, Marco; Universal Boot Shops Filed By: La Jolla Cove Shops LLC (Plaintiff); La Jolla Exclusive LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.