This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/04/2022 at 08:09:00 (UTC).

La Beaud vs Gibson

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 La Beaud filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Gibson. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

La Beaud, Shannon

Defendants

Gibson, Nicolette

Kabbany, Richard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph, James

Attorney at JUREWITZ LAW GROUP

600 B Street 1450

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Landrith, Kevin Sean

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF BROOKE E MONTGOMERY

14111 Danielson Street 100

Poway, CA 92064

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by La Beaud, Shannon. Refers to: Kabbany, Richard

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by La Beaud, Shannon. Refers to: Gibson, Nicolette

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by La Beaud, Shannon. Refers to: Gibson, Nicolette; Kabbany, Richard

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by La Beaud, Shannon. Refers to: Gibson, Nicolette; Kabbany, Richard

Complaint

Complaint filed by La Beaud, Shannon. Refers to: Gibson, Nicolette; Kabbany, Richard

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Gibson, Nicolette; Kabbany, Richard.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Gibson, Nicolette; Kabbany, Richard.

Answer

Answer (WITH POS) filed by Gibson, Nicolette; Kabbany, Richard.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Gibson, Nicolette; Kabbany, Richard.; Filed By: Gibson, Nicolette (Defendant); Kabbany, Richard (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Gibson, Nicolette; Kabbany, Richard.; Filed By: Gibson, Nicolette (Defendant); Kabbany, Richard (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (WITH POS) filed by Gibson, Nicolette; Kabbany, Richard.; Filed By: Gibson, Nicolette (Defendant); Kabbany, Richard (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by La Beaud, Shannon. Refers to: Kabbany, Richard; Filed By: La Beaud, Shannon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by La Beaud, Shannon. Refers to: Gibson, Nicolette; Filed By: La Beaud, Shannon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/10/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Caietti, Carolyn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by La Beaud, Shannon. Refers to: Gibson, Nicolette; Kabbany, Richard; Filed By: La Beaud, Shannon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by La Beaud, Shannon. Refers to: Gibson, Nicolette; Kabbany, Richard; Filed By: La Beaud, Shannon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by La Beaud, Shannon. Refers to: Gibson, Nicolette; Kabbany, Richard; Filed By: La Beaud, Shannon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph, James