This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/15/2018 at 19:09:16 (UTC).

Kyle Raymond vs Aidan Merrick Lanasa

Case Summary

On 12/05/2016 Kyle Raymond filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Aidan Merrick Lanasa. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY M. CASSERLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-NC

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

TIMOTHY M. CASSERLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAYMOND, KYLE

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LANASA, AIDAN MERRICK

GILLIS, JOHN F

WIEDEMANN, JOHN

Guardian Ad Litem

GILLIS, KIMBERLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COPLEY, ROCKY K

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ROCKY K COPLEY

225 Broadway 2100

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ELLIOTT, KELLY R

Attorney at DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

9325 Sky Park Court Suite 230

San Diego, CA 92123

LONG, JENNA LEE

Attorney at GILSLEIDER MCMAHON MOLINELLI & PHAN

340 Commerce 250

Irvine, CA 92602

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Aiden Merrick Lanasa) filed by Raymond, Kyle. Refers to: Lanasa, Aidan

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (John F Gillis) filed by Raymond, Kyle. Refers to: Gillis, John

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (John Wiedemann) filed by Raymond, Kyle. Refers to: Wiedemann, John

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Raymond, Kyle.

Order - Other

Order - Other (TRANSFERRING MATTER TO NORTH COUNTY DIVISION) filed by Raymond, Kyle.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/09/2017 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Case Transmittal and Notice of Receipt of Transferred Case SD

Case file contents transferred to receiving court San Diego pursuant to court order.

Notice of Case Transmittal and Notice of Receipt of Transferred Case SD

Transferred case received on 02/14/2017 .

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Meyer, John S. to Timothy Casserly effective 02/14/2017

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/09/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

Answer filed by Wiedemann, John.

Answer filed by Wiedemann, John. Refers to: Raymond, Kyle

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Wiedemann, John.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Wiedemann, John.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Wiedemann, John. Refers to: Lanasa, Aidan; Gillis, John

Original Summons

Original Summons (ON CROSS-COMPLAINT) filed by Wiedemann, John. Refers to: Lanasa, Aidan; Gillis, John

Answer

Answer filed by Lanasa, Aidan Merrick; Gillis, John F.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Lanasa, Aidan Merrick; Gillis, John F.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem submitted by Gillis, John F rejected on 03/13/2017.

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 04/06/2018 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other filed by Wiedemann, John. Filed By: Wiedemann, John (Cross - Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Wiedemann, John. Filed By: Wiedemann, John (Cross - Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Raymond, Kyle. Filed By: Raymond, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Raymond, Kyle. Filed By: Raymond, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Raymond, Kyle. Filed By: Raymond, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Raymond, Kyle. Filed By: Raymond, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Raymond, Kyle. Filed By: Raymond, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (John Wiedemann) filed by Raymond, Kyle. Refers to: Wiedemann, John Filed By: Raymond, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (John F Gillis) filed by Raymond, Kyle. Refers to: Gillis, John Filed By: Raymond, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Aiden Merrick Lanasa) filed by Raymond, Kyle. Refers to: Lanasa, Aidan Filed By: Raymond, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/09/2017 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Raymond, Kyle. Refers to: Lanasa, Aidan; Gillis, John; Wiedemann, John Filed By: Raymond, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Raymond, Kyle. Refers to: Lanasa, Aidan; Gillis, John; Wiedemann, John Filed By: Raymond, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Raymond, Kyle. Refers to: Lanasa, Aidan; Gillis, John; Wiedemann, John Filed By: Raymond, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COPLEY, ROCKY K