This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/07/2018 at 03:01:36 (UTC).

Kuczynski vs. Booth

Case Summary

On 02/28/2014 Kuczynski filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Booth. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY M. CASSERLY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

TIMOTHY M. CASSERLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kuczynski, Alana

Oceanside, CA 92056

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Booth, Joel Peter

Mackintosh, Margaret

Mackintosh, Stuart Barrie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MYERS, STEVEN M

2522 Chambers Road #100

Tustin, CA 92780

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ANDERSON, MICHAEL E H

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KEEVIL L MARKHAM

401 West A Street 2240

San Diego, CA 92101

WILLETT, BRYCE O

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY V DEBERNARD

401 West A Street Suite 2240

San Diego, CA 92101

THOMPSON, KELLIE B

Attorney at HARTSUYKER STRATMAN & WILLIAMS ABREGO

Po Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125-8829

 

Court Documents

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Kuczynski, Alana. Refers to: Booth, Joel; Mackintosh, Stuart; Mackintosh, Margaret

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/07/2014 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Mackintosh, Margaret; Mackintosh, Stuart Barrie.

Answer

Answer filed by Mackintosh, Margaret; Mackintosh, Stuart Barrie.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Mackintosh, Margaret; Mackintosh, Stuart Barrie. Refers to: Booth, Joel

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by Kuczynski, Alana.

Notice of Lien filed by Kuczynski, Alana.

Notice of Lien filed by Kuczynski, Alana. Refers to: Booth, Joel; Mackintosh, Margaret; Mackintosh, Stuart

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Mackintosh, Stuart Barrie; Mackintosh, Marga

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Mackintosh, Stuart Barrie; Mackintosh, Margaret. Refers to: Mackintosh, Stuart; Mackintosh, Margaret

Case Management Statement filed by Mackintosh, Stuart Barrie; Mackintosh, Margaret.

Case Management Statement filed by Mackintosh, Stuart Barrie; Mackintosh, Margaret. Refers to: Kuczynski, Alana

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Booth, Joel Peter.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/07/2014 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Booth, Joel Peter.

Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - nonagreement

Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - nonagreement filed by JOSEPH, JEFFREY.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES) filed by Kuczynski, Alana.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 01/08/2016 at 10:15:00 AM in N-31 before Timothy M. Casserly at North County.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Booth, Joel Peter. Refers to: Mackintosh, Stuart; Mackintosh, Margaret

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Mackintosh, Margaret .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Mackintosh, Stuart Barrie .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Booth, Joel Peter .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Kuczynski, Alana .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Booth, Joel Peter .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Mackintosh, Margaret .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Mackintosh, Stuart Barrie .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (STUART BARRIE MACKINTOSH) filed by Kuczynski, Alana. Refers to: Mackintosh, Stuart Filed By: Kuczynski, Alana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (MARGARET MACKINTOSH) filed by Kuczynski, Alana. Refers to: Mackintosh, Margaret Filed By: Kuczynski, Alana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (JOEL PETER BOOTH) filed by Kuczynski, Alana. Refers to: Booth, Joel Filed By: Kuczynski, Alana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/07/2014 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Kuczynski, Alana. Refers to: Booth, Joel; Mackintosh, Stuart; Mackintosh, Margaret Filed By: Kuczynski, Alana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kuczynski, Alana. Refers to: Booth, Joel; Mackintosh, Stuart; Mackintosh, Margaret Filed By: Kuczynski, Alana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Kuczynski, Alana. Refers to: Booth, Joel; Mackintosh, Stuart; Mackintosh, Margaret Filed By: Kuczynski, Alana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.