Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/20/2020 at 08:24:10 (UTC).

Ku Kucan LLC vs Laureano

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Ku Kucan LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Laureano. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ku Kucan LLC

Defendants

Castillo, Jose A

Laureano, Miriam M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Di Blasi, Chanel

Attorney at KIMBALL TIREY & ST JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Ku Kucan LLC. Refers to: Laureano, Miriam; Castillo, Jose

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ku Kucan LLC. Refers to: Laureano, Miriam; Castillo, Jose

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Ku Kucan LLC. Refers to: Laureano, Miriam; Castillo, Jose

Notice that you have been sued SD

Case initiation form printed.

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (Including Unknowns) filed by Ku Kucan LLC. Refers to: Laureano, Miriam; Castillo, Jose

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (Entered, Including Unknowns) filed by Ku Kucan LLC. Refers to: Castillo, Jose; Laureano, Miriam

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by Ku Kucan LLC received but not filed on 02/13/2020.

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Ku Kucan LLC. Refers to: Laureano, Miriam

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Ku Kucan LLC. Refers to: Castillo, Jose

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Ku Kucan LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (Including Unknowns) filed by Ku Kucan LLC. Refers to: Laureano, Miriam; Castillo, Jose Filed By: Ku Kucan LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketJudgment entered for Ku Kucan LLC and against Castillo, Jose A ;Laureano, Miriam M for a grand total of $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (Entered, Including Unknowns) filed by Ku Kucan LLC. Refers to: Castillo, Jose; Laureano, Miriam Filed By: Ku Kucan LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by Ku Kucan LLC received but not filed on 02/13/2020. Filed By: Ku Kucan LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Ku Kucan LLC. Refers to: Laureano, Miriam Filed By: Ku Kucan LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Ku Kucan LLC. Refers to: Castillo, Jose Filed By: Ku Kucan LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Ku Kucan LLC. Filed By: Ku Kucan LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Laureano, Miriam M on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Ku Kucan LLC .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketThe default filed by Ku Kucan LLC was entered as to Castillo, Jose A on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 . Override feature used.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Ku Kucan LLC. Refers to: Laureano, Miriam; Castillo, Jose Filed By: Ku Kucan LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ku Kucan LLC. Refers to: Laureano, Miriam; Castillo, Jose Filed By: Ku Kucan LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Ku Kucan LLC. Refers to: Laureano, Miriam; Castillo, Jose Filed By: Ku Kucan LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less