This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/20/2023 at 08:11:17 (UTC).

Krueger vs Murray Family Limited Partnership

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 Krueger filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Murray Family Limited Partnership. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Krueger, Timothy

Defendants

Murray Family Limited Partnership

Murray, Ed

Murray, Jerome K

Murray, Marie Diane

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mitchell, Patricia Lynne

Tsarukyan, Andranik

Defendant Attorney

Cho, Christopher I.

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Krueger, Timothy. Refers to: Murray Family Limited Partnership; Murray, Ed; Murray, Jerome; Murray, Marie

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Krueger, Timothy. Refers to: Murray Family Limited Partnership; Murray, Ed; Murray, Jerome; Murray, Marie

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Krueger, Timothy. Refers to: Murray Family Limited Partnership; Murray, Ed; Murray, Jerome; Murray, Marie

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Murray, Ed; Murray, Marie Diane; Murray Family Limited Partnership.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Murray, Ed; Murray, Marie Diane; Murray Family Limited Partnership.; Filed By: Murray, Ed (Defendant); Murray, Marie Diane (Defendant); Murray Family Limited Partnership (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/02/2023 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Krueger, Timothy. Refers to: Murray Family Limited Partnership; Murray, Ed; Murray, Jerome; Murray, Marie; Filed By: Krueger, Timothy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Krueger, Timothy. Refers to: Murray Family Limited Partnership; Murray, Ed; Murray, Jerome; Murray, Marie; Filed By: Krueger, Timothy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Krueger, Timothy. Refers to: Murray Family Limited Partnership; Murray, Ed; Murray, Jerome; Murray, Marie; Filed By: Krueger, Timothy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less