This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/11/2021 at 08:09:46 (UTC).

Kroesing vs Frazier

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Kroesing filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Frazier. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

Kroesing, Stephen

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Frazier, Breanna

Specialized Waste Solutions Inc

Lisicki, Jonathan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Green, Sabrina L

Attorney at STRATTON & GREEN ALC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

RONIS, GEORGE J

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kroesing, Stephen. Refers to: Frazier, Breanna; Lisicki, Jonathan; Specialized Waste Solutions Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Kroesing, Stephen. Refers to: Frazier, Breanna; Lisicki, Jonathan; Specialized Waste Solutions Inc

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Frazier, Breanna. Refers to: Kroesing, Stephen

Answer

Answer filed by Frazier, Breanna.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Frazier, Breanna. Refers to: Kroesing, Stephen Filed By: Frazier, Breanna (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Frazier, Breanna. Filed By: Frazier, Breanna (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/05/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Kroesing, Stephen. Refers to: Frazier, Breanna; Lisicki, Jonathan; Specialized Waste Solutions Inc Filed By: Kroesing, Stephen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kroesing, Stephen. Refers to: Frazier, Breanna; Lisicki, Jonathan; Specialized Waste Solutions Inc Filed By: Kroesing, Stephen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RONIS, GEORGE J